EP2865056 - LASER MODULE FOR HOMOGENEOUS LINE-SHAPED INTENSITY PROFILES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2017 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRUMPF Photonic Components GmbH Lise-Meitner-Strasse 13 89081 Ulm / DE | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/12] | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips GmbH Lübeckertordamm 5 20099 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2015/18] | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips GmbH Lübeckertordamm 5 20099 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRONENBORN, Stephan c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
POLLMANN-RETSCH, Jens c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2015/18] | Representative(s) | Trumpf Patentabteilung Trumpf GmbH & Co KG TH550 Patente und Lizenzen Johann-Maus-Straße 2 71254 Ditzingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/18] | Coops, Peter Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 13765444.8 | 26.06.2013 | WO2013IB55241 | Priority number, date | US201261664218P | 26.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261664218 P | [2015/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014002024 | Date: | 03.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2865056 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/022, H01S5/42, H01S5/00, H01S5/183 | [2015/18] | CPC: |
H01S5/423 (EP,US);
H01S5/026 (US);
H01S5/02326 (EP,US);
H01S5/426 (US);
H01S5/005 (EP,US);
H01S5/0225 (RU);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] | Title | German: | LASERMODUL FÜR HOMOGENE LINIENFÖRMIGEN INTENSITÄTSPROFILE | [2015/18] | English: | LASER MODULE FOR HOMOGENEOUS LINE-SHAPED INTENSITY PROFILES | [2015/18] | French: | MODULE LASER POUR PROFILS D'INTENSITÉ EN FORME DE LIGNE HOMOGÈNE | [2015/18] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/18] | 13.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.12.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.07.2016 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.12.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5477259 (IWASA HIROSHI [JP]) [X] 1,7-10 * column 3, line 46 - column 7, line 43; figures 1-10 *; | [XI]US6084848 (GOTO KENYA [JP]) [X] 1-3,7-10 * column 3, line 19 - column 9, line 11; figures 5-9 * [I] 5; | [Y]US2009059255 (OHIDE TOSHIO [JP]) [Y] 1-10* paragraphs [0030] - [0050]; figures 1-3 *; | [Y] - MOENCH HOLGER ET AL, "Modular VCSEL solution for uniform line illumination in the kW range", HIGH-POWER DIODE LASER TECHNOLOGY AND APPLICATIONS X, SPIE, 1000 20TH ST. BELLINGHAM WA 98225-6705 USA, (20120209), vol. 8241, no. 1, doi:10.1117/12.906666, pages 82410B1 - 82410B12, XP060001634 [Y] 1-10 * pages 82410B-2, paragraph 5 - pages 82410B-9, paragraph 1; figures 1-15 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.906666 | by applicant | WO2011021140 |