EP2994270 - ABRASIVE TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REN S.r.l. Via Carducci, 8 20123 Milano / IT | [2016/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FIORE, Nicola Via Santa Maria 59 I-20015 Parabiago (Milano) / IT | [2016/11] | Representative(s) | Long, Giorgio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [2016/11] | Application number, filing date | 13765475.2 | 09.07.2013 | [2016/11] | WO2013IB55639 | Priority number, date | IT2013MI00734 | 07.05.2013 Original published format: IT MI20130734 | [2016/11] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014181157 | Date: | 13.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2994270 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B24D13/16 | [2016/11] | CPC: |
B24D13/16 (EP,US);
B24D18/0045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/11] | Title | German: | SCHLEIFWERKZEUG | [2016/11] | English: | ABRASIVE TOOL | [2016/11] | French: | OUTIL ABRASIF | [2016/11] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/11] | 17.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2016 | Observations by third parties | 23.11.2016 | Observations by third parties | 07.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2017 | Observations by third parties | 20.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/46] | 12.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2002086630 (CHEN HSIEN-TA [TW]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0010] - [0020]; figures 2,3; claim 1 * [A] 3,13,14 [I] 2,4-6,8-12; | [I]EP2153939 (RUEGGEBERG AUGUST GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [I] 7-12 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016]; figure 6; claim 4 *; | [AD]WO2012157006 (FIORE NICOLA [IT]) [AD] 11,12 * the whole document * | Examination | DE102011108859 | US3867795 | - Malachi Witt, "ZEC - Semiflex Grinding / Cutting Disc", (20130104), URL: https://www.abrasivesinternational.com/index.php/menu-category-products-zec-discs/products-zec-semi-flex, (20170201), XP055341234 | - Anonymous, "ZEC | SEMIFLEX | ABRASIVE DISCS", (20131211), URL: http://www.zec.com/semiflex.html, (20170201), XP055341224 |