EP2904273 - FAN AND ASSOCIATED SUPPORT ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ebm-papst Mulfingen GmbH & Co. KG Bachmühle 2 74673 Mulfingen / DE | For all designated states Kelvion Refrigeration GmbH Kühler Weg 1 82065 Baierbrunn / DE | [2016/15] |
Former [2015/33] | For all designated states ebm-papst Mulfingen GmbH & Co. KG Bachmühle 2 74673 Mulfingen / DE | ||
For all designated states GEA Küba GmbH Kühler Weg 1 82065 Baierbrunn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HELI, Thomas Michelbacher Str. 46 74595 Langenburg / DE | 02 /
RIEGLER, Peter An der Dell 97944 Boxberg / DE | 03 /
GÜNTHER, Jörg Mühlrain 7 74677 Dörzbach / DE | 04 /
SECULI, Gheorghe-Mircea Otto-Wagner-Str. 64b 82210 Germering / DE | 05 /
KORINTH, Christoph Aschauerstraße 7 82418 Murnau / DE | [2015/33] | Representative(s) | Dr. Solf & Zapf Patent- und Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/50] | Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | ||
Former [2015/33] | Solf, Annkathrin Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13765673.2 | 12.09.2013 | [2015/33] | WO2013EP68925 | Priority number, date | DE201210109518 | 08.10.2012 Original published format: DE102012109518 | [2015/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014056671 | Date: | 17.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2904273 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2904273 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F04D25/06, F04D25/08, F04D29/52, F04D29/64 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
F04D25/068 (EP,CN,US);
F04D25/06 (RU);
F04D29/644 (US);
F04D19/002 (US);
F04D25/0693 (US);
F04D25/08 (EP,CN,US);
F04D29/522 (EP,CN,US);
F04D29/601 (EP,US);
F04D29/64 (RU);
F04D29/646 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VENTILATOR SOWIE ZUGEHÖRIGES TRÄGERELEMENT | [2015/33] | English: | FAN AND ASSOCIATED SUPPORT ELEMENT | [2015/33] | French: | VENTILATEUR ET ÉLÉMENT DE SUPPORT ASSOCIÉ | [2015/33] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/33] | 27.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.09.2013 | AL | 14.12.2016 | CY | 14.12.2016 | CZ | 14.12.2016 | DK | 14.12.2016 | EE | 14.12.2016 | FI | 14.12.2016 | HR | 14.12.2016 | LT | 14.12.2016 | LV | 14.12.2016 | MK | 14.12.2016 | MT | 14.12.2016 | PL | 14.12.2016 | RO | 14.12.2016 | RS | 14.12.2016 | SE | 14.12.2016 | SI | 14.12.2016 | SK | 14.12.2016 | SM | 14.12.2016 | BG | 14.03.2017 | NO | 14.03.2017 | GR | 15.03.2017 | IS | 14.04.2017 | PT | 14.04.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 12.09.2013 | |
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MK | 14.12.2016 | ||
MT | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 12.09.2013 | |
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MT | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 12.09.2013 | |
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MT | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MT | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 14.12.2016 | |
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 14.12.2016 | |
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 14.12.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2697163 (SPEAR WALTER A) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * * figure 6 *; | [X]GB749685 (COLCHESTER WOODS, et al) [X] 1,17* the whole document *; | [X]US4838151 (SHIN-CHIN SHAO [TW]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9302291 (ISAAC RICHARD JOHN [GB]) [X] 1,17 * the whole document *; | [X]JP2000303998 (NIHON DENSAN KK) [X] 1,2,17,18 * abstract *; | [X]EP1739367 (EMERSON NETWORK POWER SRL [IT]) [X] 1-3,17,18 * the whole document * * figures 1,4 * |