EP2882804 - REDISPERSIBLE POLYMER POWDER MIXTURES FOR USE IN DRY-MIX FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Company 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, PA 19106 / US | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2015/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM-HABERMEHL, Linda 15 Burrell Court Midland, MI 48640 / US | 02 /
WESTMEYER, Mark D. 742 Jamestown Road Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | 03 /
CHEN, Liang 2304 Longfellow Lane Midland, MI 48640 / US | 04 /
HONG, Liang 2812 Walden Woods Drive Midland, MI 48640 / US | 05 /
LADIKA, Mladen 4714 Blossom Circle Midland, MI 48642 / US | [2015/25] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2015/25] | Application number, filing date | 13766208.6 | 13.09.2013 | [2016/35] | WO2013US59571 | Priority number, date | US201261707026P | 28.09.2012 Original published format: US 201261707026 P | [2015/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014052033 | Date: | 03.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2882804 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2882804 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/08, C08L25/08, C04B40/00 | [2015/25] | CPC: |
C04B28/04 (EP,CN,US);
C08L31/04 (US);
C04B28/06 (EP,CN,US);
C04B40/0042 (EP,CN,US);
C08L23/0853 (EP,US);
C08L23/0869 (EP,CN,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B28/04, C04B14/06, C04B22/10, C04B22/143, C04B24/06, C04B24/2623, C04B24/2676, C04B24/383 (US,CN,EP);
C04B28/06, C04B24/2623, C04B24/2676, C04B40/0608 (CN,EP,US);
C04B40/0042, C04B2103/0057 (CN);
C04B40/0042, C04B2103/0057, C04B2103/0057 (US,EP);
C04B40/0042, C04B2103/0057, C04B2103/0065 (EP,US,CN);
C04B40/0042, C04B24/2623, C04B24/2676 (US,CN,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REDISPERGIERBARE POLYMERPULVERMISCHUNGEN ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI TROCKENMISCHFORMULIERUNGEN | [2015/25] | English: | REDISPERSIBLE POLYMER POWDER MIXTURES FOR USE IN DRY-MIX FORMULATIONS | [2015/25] | French: | MÉLANGES DE POUDRES DE POLYMÈRE REDISPERSIBLES POUR UNE UTILISATION DANS DES FORMULATIONS DE MÉLANGE À SEC | [2015/25] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/25] | 22.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.09.2013 | AL | 31.08.2016 | AT | 31.08.2016 | BE | 31.08.2016 | CY | 31.08.2016 | CZ | 31.08.2016 | DK | 31.08.2016 | EE | 31.08.2016 | ES | 31.08.2016 | FI | 31.08.2016 | HR | 31.08.2016 | IS | 31.08.2016 | LT | 31.08.2016 | LV | 31.08.2016 | MC | 31.08.2016 | MK | 31.08.2016 | PL | 31.08.2016 | RO | 31.08.2016 | RS | 31.08.2016 | SE | 31.08.2016 | SI | 31.08.2016 | SK | 31.08.2016 | SM | 31.08.2016 | IE | 13.09.2016 | LU | 13.09.2016 | MT | 30.09.2016 | BG | 30.11.2016 | NO | 30.11.2016 | GR | 01.12.2016 | PT | 02.01.2017 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/35] | HU | 13.09.2013 | |
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IS | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
MK | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
IE | 13.09.2016 | ||
LU | 13.09.2016 | ||
MT | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 13.09.2013 | |
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IS | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
MK | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
IE | 13.09.2016 | ||
LU | 13.09.2016 | ||
MT | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 13.09.2013 | |
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IS | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
MK | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
IE | 13.09.2016 | ||
LU | 13.09.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
IE | 13.09.2016 | ||
LU | 13.09.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
IE | 13.09.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
IE | 13.09.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 31.08.2016 | |
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 31.08.2016 | |
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 31.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2399955 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2433984 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [A] 1-10* the whole document * |