Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015259565 | ![]() | 17.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12190376 | 29.10.2012 | WO2013EP69769 | 24.09.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102146103B | ![]() | 21.08.2020 | B1 | KR20150073978 | 01.07.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | EP12190376 | 29.10.2012 | WO2013EP69769 | 24.09.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6183927B | ![]() | 23.08.2017 | B2 | JP2015533904 | 26.11.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | EP12190376 | 29.10.2012 | WO2013EP69769 | 24.09.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL238055 | ![]() | 29.05.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | EP12190376 | 29.10.2012 | WO2013EP69769 | 24.09.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104870582B | ![]() | 03.11.2017 | B | CN104870582 | 26.08.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | EP12190376 | 29.10.2012 | WO2013EP69769 | 24.09.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2884872 | ![]() | 01.09.2020 | C | CA2884872 | 08.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12190376 | 29.10.2012 | WO2013EP69769 | 24.09.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2013339747B | ![]() | 29.09.2016 | B2 | AU2013339747 | 02.04.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12190376 | 29.10.2012 | WO2013EP69769 | 24.09.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2912125 | ![]() | 02.11.2016 | B1 | EP2912125 | 02.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12190376 | 29.10.2012 | WO2013EP69769 | 24.09.2013 | EP13766303 | 24.09.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015006556 | 18.01.2022 | B1 | BR112015006556 | 20.03.2018 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP12190376 | 29.10.2012 | WO2013EP69769 | 24.09.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2912125T | 13.02.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP12190376 | 29.10.2012 | WO2013EP69769 | 24.09.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA028728 | 29.12.2017 | B1 | EA201590832 | 31.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12190376 | 29.10.2012 | WO2013EP69769 | 24.09.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2614246T | 30.05.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP12190376 | 29.10.2012 | WO2013EP69769 | 24.09.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1213589 | 08.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12190376 | 29.10.2012 | WO2013EP69769 | 24.09.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN2024DELNP2015 | 14.08.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | EP12190376 | 29.10.2012 | WO2013EP69769 | 24.09.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX366092 | 27.06.2019 | B | MX2015004995 | 17.07.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | EP12190376 | 29.10.2012 | WO2013EP69769 | 24.09.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY182933 | 05.02.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | EP12190376 | 29.10.2012 | WO2013EP69769 | 24.09.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH12015500656 | 15.11.2019 | B1 | PH12015500656 | 11.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12190376 | 29.10.2012 | WO2013EP69769 | 24.09.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2912125T | 28.04.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP12190376 | 29.10.2012 | EP13766303 | 24.09.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS55665 | 30.06.2017 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP12190376 | 29.10.2012 | WO2013EP69769 | 24.09.2013 | EP13766303 | 24.09.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201501959W | 28.05.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | EP12190376 | 29.10.2012 | WO2013EP69769 | 24.09.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA113457 | 25.01.2017 | C2 | Priority number | Date | EP12190376 | 29.10.2012 | WO2013EP69769 | 24.09.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014067715 | ![]() | 08.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12190376 | 29.10.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR093100 | 20.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12190376 | 29.10.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2015001091 | 07.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12190376 | 29.10.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CO7400863 | 30.09.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP12190376 | 29.10.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE030494T | 29.05.2017 | T2 | Priority number | Date | EP12190376 | 29.10.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2912125T | 03.01.2017 | T | Priority number | Date | EP12190376 | 29.10.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW201425401 | 01.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | EP12190376 | 29.10.2012 |