EP2912125 - PROTECTIVE COATINGS FOR SECURITY DOCUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SICPA HOLDING SA Avenue de Florissant 41 1008 Prilly / CH | [2016/42] |
Former [2015/36] | For all designated states Sicpa Holding SA Av. de Florissant 41 1008 Prilly / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VEYA, Patrick Chemin de Radez 5 CH-1121 Bremblens / CH | 02 /
GARNIER, Jean Rue de Sadaz 4 CH-1373 Chavornay / CH | [2015/36] | Representative(s) | Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [2015/36] | Application number, filing date | 13766303.5 | 24.09.2013 | [2015/36] | WO2013EP69769 | Priority number, date | EP20120190376 | 29.10.2012 Original published format: EP 12190376 | [2015/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014067715 | Date: | 08.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2912125 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2912125 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C09D171/00, B41M7/02, B41M7/00, B42D15/00 | [2015/36] | CPC: |
C09D163/00 (EP,CN,US);
B05D3/06 (CN,US);
B41M7/0045 (EP,CN,US);
B42D15/00 (CN);
B42D25/29 (EP,US);
B42D25/30 (US);
B42D25/351 (EP,US);
B42D25/36 (EP,US);
B42D25/40 (EP,US);
C08G65/007 (EP,US);
C08G65/20 (EP,US);
C08K5/06 (EP,US);
C09D163/10 (EP,US);
C09D171/00 (EP,CN,US);
C08G2650/48 (EP,US);
C08L2205/03 (CN);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2481 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24934 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09D163/00, C08L63/10 (CN);
C09D163/00, C08L63/10, C08L83/04 (CN);
C09D163/00, C08L71/02 (US,EP);
C09D163/10, C08L71/02 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUTZBESCHICHTUNGEN FÜR SICHERHEITSDOKUMENTE | [2015/36] | English: | PROTECTIVE COATINGS FOR SECURITY DOCUMENTS | [2015/36] | French: | REVÊTEMENTS PROTECTEURS POUR DES DOCUMENTS DE SÉCURITÉ | [2016/31] |
Former [2015/36] | REVÊTEMENTS DE PROTECTION POUR DOCUMENTS DE SÉCURITÉ | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/36] | 17.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 02.11.2016 | CY | 02.11.2016 | EE | 02.11.2016 | HR | 02.11.2016 | LT | 02.11.2016 | LV | 02.11.2016 | MC | 02.11.2016 | MK | 02.11.2016 | SI | 02.11.2016 | SK | 02.11.2016 | SM | 02.11.2016 | IS | 02.03.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2019/51] | CY | 02.11.2016 | |
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
MK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | CY | 02.11.2016 | |
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | EE | 02.11.2016 | |
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | EE | 02.11.2016 | |
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/43] | EE | 02.11.2016 | |
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
SM | 02.11.2016 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | EE | 02.11.2016 | |
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | HR | 02.11.2016 | |
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 02.11.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP0739923 (AUSIMONT SPA [IT]) [X] 1,3,6,16 * page 15, line 27 - page 17, line 59 * * page 19, line 18 - page 20, line 1 * [I] 2,4,5,7-9; | [X]EP1344807 (SOLVAY SOLEXIS SPA [IT]) [X] 1,3,16 * paragraphs [0021] , [0029] , [0155]; claims 1,9,10 *; | [A]WO2004072378 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 10-15* the whole document *; | [A]DE102008058397 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 10-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US3847978 | US3972856 | US4775653 | EP0256170 | EP0119425 | US5057628 | US6200628 | US2002127339 | WO02094577 | WO2006021856 | US2007017647 | WO2008054581 | EP1932678 | EP2125713 | - HANS A. M. DE HEIJ, "The design methodology of Dutch banknotes", IS&T/SPIE'S 12TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON ELECTRONIC IMAGING, OPTICAL SECURITY AND COUNTERFEIT DETERRENCE TECHNIQUES III, SAN JOSE, CALIF., USA, (20000127), vol. 3973, pages 2 - 22 | - "Bank of England Tests Durability in Circulation Trials", CURRENCY NEWS, (201203), vol. 10, no. 3, page 5 | - Chemistry & Technology of UV & EB Formulation for Coatings, Inks & Paints, JOHN WILEY & SONS IN ASSOCIATION WITH SITA TECHNOLOGY LIMITED, (1997), vol. 7 | - "Photoinitiators for Free Radical Cationic and Anionic Polymerization", J. V. CRIVELLO; K. DIETLIKER, Chemistry & Technology of UV & EB Formulation for Coatings, Inks & Paints, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1998), vol. III | - OWENS D. K.; WENDT R. C., J. APPL. POLYM. SCI., (1969), vol. 13, page 1741 | - R.H. LEACH; R.J. PIERCE, The Printing ink manual, SPRINGER, pages 58 - 62 | - J. M. ADAMS; P.A. DOLIN, Printing Technology, DELMAR THOMSON LEARNING, pages 293 - 328 | - J. M. ADAMS; P.A. DOLIN, Printing Technology, DELMAR THOMSON LEARNING, pages 359 - 360 |