EP2898025 - AQUEOUS COATING COMPOSITIONS INCLUDING THE REACTION PRODUCT OF MALEIC ANHYDRIDE WITH AN UNSATURATED COMPOUND AND AN AMINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel Coatings International B.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [2015/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRAUN, Gary Pierce 409 Crescent Drive Berea, Ohio 44017 / US | 02 /
RADEMACHER, Jude Thomas 714 Hearthstone Circle Akron, Ohio 44320 / US | 03 /
GEELEN, Patricia Heulsstraat 12B NL-6413 EJ Heerlen / NL | [2015/31] | Representative(s) | Akzo Nobel IP Department Christian Neefestraat 2 1077 WW Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/31] | Akzo Nobel IP Department Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | Application number, filing date | 13766497.5 | 19.09.2013 | [2020/18] | WO2013EP69423 | Priority number, date | US201261702789P | 19.09.2012 Original published format: US 201261702789 P | EP20120188180 | 11.10.2012 Original published format: EP 12188180 | US201361815814P | 25.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361815814 P | [2015/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014044732 | Date: | 27.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2898025 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2898025 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/00, C09D7/00, C09F7/00, C23F11/00, B65D23/02, C07D207/40 | [2019/39] | CPC: |
C09D5/00 (EP,RU,US);
B65D23/02 (EP,RU,US);
C09D191/005 (RU,US);
C07D207/40 (EP,RU,US);
C07D207/408 (EP,RU,US);
C09D125/08 (RU,US);
C09D133/00 (RU,US);
C09D163/00 (RU,US);
C09D173/02 (RU,US);
C09D175/04 (RU,US);
C09D7/00 (EP,RU,US);
C09D7/45 (EP,RU,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/31] | C09D5/00, C09D7/00, C09D7/02, C09F7/00, C23F11/00, B65D23/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT DEM REAKTIONSPRODUKT VON MALEINSÄUREANHYDRID MIT EINER UNGESÄTTIGTEN VERBINDUNG UND EINEM AMIN | [2019/39] | English: | AQUEOUS COATING COMPOSITIONS INCLUDING THE REACTION PRODUCT OF MALEIC ANHYDRIDE WITH AN UNSATURATED COMPOUND AND AN AMINE | [2015/31] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE REVÊTEMENT AQUEUSES INCLUANT UN PRODUIT DE LA RÉACTION DE L'ANHYDRIDE MALÉIQUE AVEC UN COMPOSÉ INSATURÉ ET UNE AMINE | [2019/39] |
Former [2015/31] | WÄSSERIGE BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT DEM REAKTIONSPRODUKT VON MALEINSÄUREANHYDRID MIT EINER UNGESÄTTIGTEN VERBINDUNG UND EINEM AMIN | ||
Former [2015/31] | COMPOSITIONS DE REVÊTEMENT AQUEUSES COMPRENANT LE PRODUIT DE RÉACTION D'ANHYDRIDE MALÉIQUE AVEC UN COMPOSÉ INSATURÉ ET UNE AMINE | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/31] | 02.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.11.2019 | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.09.2013 | AL | 29.04.2020 | AT | 29.04.2020 | CY | 29.04.2020 | CZ | 29.04.2020 | DK | 29.04.2020 | EE | 29.04.2020 | FI | 29.04.2020 | HR | 29.04.2020 | LT | 29.04.2020 | LV | 29.04.2020 | MC | 29.04.2020 | MK | 29.04.2020 | MT | 29.04.2020 | NL | 29.04.2020 | PL | 29.04.2020 | RO | 29.04.2020 | RS | 29.04.2020 | SE | 29.04.2020 | SI | 29.04.2020 | SK | 29.04.2020 | SM | 29.04.2020 | TR | 29.04.2020 | BG | 29.07.2020 | NO | 29.07.2020 | GR | 30.07.2020 | IS | 29.08.2020 | PT | 31.08.2020 | IE | 19.09.2020 | LU | 19.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 19.09.2013 | |
AL | 29.04.2020 | ||
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CY | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
MT | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
TR | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
IE | 19.09.2020 | ||
LU | 19.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
TR | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
IE | 19.09.2020 | ||
LU | 19.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
IE | 19.09.2020 | ||
LU | 19.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
LU | 19.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
LU | 19.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 29.04.2020 | |
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 29.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3293201 (SHAHADE FRED S, et al); | [Y]WO2009006527 (GEORGIA PACIFIC CHEMICALS LLC [US], et al); | [I]US2009029155 (GOETHLICH ALEXANDER [DE], et al) |