EP2979428 - EFFICIENT SOCKET TRANSFER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2016/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COX, Matthew R. c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
PASHOV, Ivan D. c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
SILVERA, Jonathan A. c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
SLIWOWICZ, Paul c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2016/05] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2017/43] |
Former [2016/05] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13767184.8 | 12.09.2013 | [2016/05] | WO2013US59331 | Priority number, date | US201313852904 | 28.03.2013 Original published format: US201313852904 | [2016/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014158217 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2979428 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2979428 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, H04L29/06 | [2016/05] | CPC: |
G06F13/385 (EP,US);
H04L69/162 (US);
H04L69/326 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EFFIZIENTER SOCKETTRANSFER | [2017/01] | English: | EFFICIENT SOCKET TRANSFER | [2016/05] | French: | TRANSFERT DE PRISE EFFICACE | [2017/01] |
Former [2016/05] | EFFIZIENTE ÜBERTRAGUNG AUS EINER STECKDOSE | ||
Former [2016/05] | TRANSFERT EFFICACE DE CONNECTEUR LOGICIEL | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2015 | Examination requested [2016/05] | 06.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.09.2013 | AL | 25.10.2017 | AT | 25.10.2017 | CY | 25.10.2017 | CZ | 25.10.2017 | DK | 25.10.2017 | EE | 25.10.2017 | ES | 25.10.2017 | FI | 25.10.2017 | HR | 25.10.2017 | IT | 25.10.2017 | LT | 25.10.2017 | LV | 25.10.2017 | MC | 25.10.2017 | MK | 25.10.2017 | PL | 25.10.2017 | PT | 25.10.2017 | RO | 25.10.2017 | RS | 25.10.2017 | SE | 25.10.2017 | SI | 25.10.2017 | SK | 25.10.2017 | SM | 25.10.2017 | TR | 25.10.2017 | BG | 25.01.2018 | NO | 25.01.2018 | GR | 26.01.2018 | IS | 25.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 12.09.2013 | |
AT | 25.10.2017 | ||
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MK | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 12.09.2013 | |
AT | 25.10.2017 | ||
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
ES | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 25.10.2017 | |
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0033189 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 3 - line 35 * * page 4, line 17 - page 5, line 18 * * page 6, line 32 - page 7, line 20 ** page 11, line 27 - page 12, line 11; figures 2-5,9; claim 1 *; | [A]US2005101179 (KIM CHUL-MIN [KR]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0039]; figure 1; claims 1-5,10-12 *; | [XI]EP2124397 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,2,6 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0038]; figures 3,4,6,7; claims 1-7 * [I] 3-5,7-10; | [A]US2011153834 (BHARRAT SHAUN JAIKARRAN [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0120] - paragraph [0123]; figures 6,7; claims 1-3 * |