EP2830687 - AIR DETECTION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETECTING AIR IN A PUMP OF AN INFUSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ICU Medical, Inc. 951 Calle Amanecer San Clemente, CA 92673 / US | [2019/30] |
Former [2017/40] | For all designated states ICU Medical, Inc. 951 Calle Amanecer San Clemente, CA 92673 / US | ||
Former [2015/06] | For all designated states Hospira, Inc. Dept. NLEG, H1 275 North Field Drive Lake Forest, IL 60045-2579 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUCHTI, Timothy L. 543 Old Walnut Circle Gurnee, Illinois 60031 / US | 02 /
MARKEY, Brian G. 220 Lee Street Park Forest, Illinois 60466 / US | 03 /
BELKIN, Anatoly S. 2756 Porter Court Glenview, Illinois 60026 / US | 04 /
KOTNIK, Paul T. 4598 Ravinewood Drive Commerce Township, Michigan 48382 / US | 05 /
KHAIR, Mohammad M. 5 Hummingbird Lane Streamwood, Illinois 60107 / US | [2015/06] | Representative(s) | Invent Horizon IP Nordenskiöldsgatan 11A 211 19 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/30] | Invent Horizon IP Barometergatan 16B 211 17 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2015/06] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano & Partners Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13768125.0 | 27.03.2013 | [2019/30] | WO2013US34041 | Priority number, date | US201261618129P | 30.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261618129 P | [2015/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013148798 | Date: | 03.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2830687 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2830687 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/36, A61M5/168, F04B43/00, F04B51/00 | [2016/14] | CPC: |
A61M5/16831 (EP,US);
G01F1/74 (US);
A61M5/365 (EP,US);
F04B43/0081 (EP,US);
F04B51/00 (EP,US);
A61M2205/331 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/06] | A61M5/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUFTDETEKTIONSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS VON LUFT IN EINER PUMPE EINES INFUSIONSSYSTEMS | [2015/06] | English: | AIR DETECTION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETECTING AIR IN A PUMP OF AN INFUSION SYSTEM | [2015/06] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION D'AIR ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'AIR DANS UNE POMPE D'UN SYSTÈME DE PERFUSION | [2015/06] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2014 | Search fee paid | 09.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/06] | 04.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 11.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 19.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 17.12.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 17.12.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.01.2019 | Decision despatched | 17.12.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 17.12.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.01.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.03.2013 | AL | 24.07.2019 | AT | 24.07.2019 | CY | 24.07.2019 | CZ | 24.07.2019 | DK | 24.07.2019 | EE | 24.07.2019 | FI | 24.07.2019 | HR | 24.07.2019 | LT | 24.07.2019 | LV | 24.07.2019 | MC | 24.07.2019 | MK | 24.07.2019 | MT | 24.07.2019 | NL | 24.07.2019 | PL | 24.07.2019 | RO | 24.07.2019 | RS | 24.07.2019 | SE | 24.07.2019 | SI | 24.07.2019 | SK | 24.07.2019 | SM | 24.07.2019 | BG | 24.10.2019 | NO | 24.10.2019 | GR | 25.10.2019 | IS | 24.11.2019 | PT | 25.11.2019 | IE | 27.03.2020 | LU | 27.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | CH | 31.03.2020 | LI | 31.03.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 27.03.2013 | |
AL | 24.07.2019 | ||
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CY | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
MT | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IE | 27.03.2020 | ||
LU | 27.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IE | 27.03.2020 | ||
LU | 27.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IE | 27.03.2020 | ||
LU | 27.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
LU | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 24.07.2019 | |
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 24.07.2019 | |
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | NL | 24.07.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0462405 (BOC GROUP INC [US]); | [A]US6485263 (BRYANT ROBERT J [US], et al); | [X]US2004120825 (BOUTON CHAD E [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US7517332 (TONELLI CLAUDIO [IT], et al); | [Y]US2011064612 (FRANZONI GIUSEPPE [IT], et al); | [Y]WO2011080188 (GAMBRO LUNDIA AB [SE], et al); | [Y]US7981082 (WANG DAVID T [US], et al); | [Y]US2012025995 (MOBERG SHELDON B [US], et al); |