EP2839299 - MOBILE DEVICE CONFIGURED TO TRAVEL ON A TRANSMISSION LINE AND PROVIDE ASSISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.02.2019 [2019/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elwha LLC 3150 139th Avenue SE Bellevue, WA 98005-4046 / US | [2015/38] |
Former [2015/26] | For all designated states Elwha LLC 3150 129th Avenue SE Bellevue, WA 98005-4046 / US | ||
Former [2015/09] | For all designated states Elwha LLC 11235 SE 6th Street Suite 200 Bellevue, Washington 98004-6481 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HYDE, Roderick A. 9915 - 161st Avenue N.E. Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 02 /
WOOD, Lowell L. 989 112th Avenue NE 2310 Bellevue, Washington 98004 / US | [2015/09] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/09] | Harris, Ian Richard D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 13768130.0 | 27.03.2013 | WO2013US34037 | Priority number, date | US201213436520 | 30.03.2012 Original published format: US201213436520 | [2015/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013148794 | Date: | 03.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2839299 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01R15/00, H02G1/04 | [2016/49] | CPC: |
H02G1/04 (EP);
G06V20/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2015/09] | G01R15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/09] | Title | German: | MOBILE VORRICHTUNG MIT KONFIGURATION ZUR FORTBEWEGUNG AUF EINER ÜBERTRAGUNGSLEITUNG UND ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON UNTERSTÜTZUNG | [2015/09] | English: | MOBILE DEVICE CONFIGURED TO TRAVEL ON A TRANSMISSION LINE AND PROVIDE ASSISTANCE | [2015/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF MOBILE CONFIGURÉ POUR SE DÉPLACER SUR UNE LIGNE DE TRANSMISSION ET FOURNIR UNE ASSISTANCE | [2015/09] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2014 | Search fee paid | 29.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/09] | 24.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/06] | 28.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6293520 (TURNER RUSSELL WAYNE [US]) [X] 1-8,12-15 * the whole document *; | [XY]DE3228239 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document * [Y] 13-15; | [X]DE4240291 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-8,12-15 * the whole document *; | [XA]US6540207 (BARNES DONALD L [US]) [X] 1-3,6-10 * the whole document * [A] 13; | [XD]US2007009215 (SALES CASALS LLUIS R [ES]) [XD] 1-8,13-15 * page 4, paragraph 88 - paragraph 92; figures 5-6 *; | [YA]US2011196535 (PHILLIPS ANDREW JOHN [US], et al) [Y] 13-15 * abstract * [A] 1-3,6,7,11,12 | International search | [Y]US2005133244 (DEVINE CLIFFORD W [CA], et al); | [X]US2007009215 (SALES CASALS LLUIS R [ES]); | [A]US2008246010 (BARTHOLD LIONEL O [US]) |