EP2830796 - LABELING OF ITEMS WITH WASH-OFF LABELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.04.2016 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.05.2016 [2016/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UPM Raflatac Oy Tesomankatu 31 33310 Tampere / FI | [2015/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITCHELL, Noel Horather Str. 180A 42111 Wuppertal / DE | 02 /
METSÄJOKI, Kati Karsikontie 16 A 3 FI-33960 Pirkkala / FI | [2015/06] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2015/06] | Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy Hermiankatu 1 B 33720 Tampere / FI | Application number, filing date | 13768199.5 | 25.03.2013 | WO2013FI50333 | Priority number, date | FI20120005344 | 27.03.2012 Original published format: FI 20125344 | US201261616031P | 27.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261616031 P | [2015/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013144443 | Date: | 03.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2830796 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 03.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B23B7/10, B23B27/08, G09F3/04, C09J7/02 | [2015/06] | CPC: |
B32B7/10 (EP,CN,FI,US);
B65C1/02 (US);
B32B27/08 (EP,CN,FI,US);
B32B38/10 (US);
B32B43/006 (US);
B65C3/00 (US);
B65C9/25 (EP,FI,US);
B65D25/205 (US);
C09J5/00 (EP,CN,US);
C09J7/20 (EP,CN,US);
G09F3/02 (EP,CN,US);
G09F3/04 (EP,CN,FI,US);
G09F3/10 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2307/736 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2309/02 (US);
B32B2519/00 (EP,CN,US);
C09J2203/334 (EP,CN,US);
C09J2301/304 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/06] | Title | German: | MARKIERUNG VON GEGENSTÄNDEN MIT ABWASCHBAREN ETIKETTEN | [2015/06] | English: | LABELING OF ITEMS WITH WASH-OFF LABELS | [2015/06] | French: | ÉTIQUETAGE D'ARTICLES AVEC DES ÉTIQUETTES LAVABLES | [2015/06] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 03.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/06] | 07.04.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0788972 (RICOH KK [JP]) [A] 1-12* page 4, line 52 - line 59 *; | [Y]WO0062273 (STEINBEIS PPL GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-12 * page 9, line 4 - line 26 * * page 12, line 21 - page 13, line 24 * * figures 1-1c *; | [Y]EP1400455 (KHS MASCH & ANLAGENBAU AG [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0021] , [0 23]; figure 1 *; | [A]EP2017810 (SANTIAGO VALVERDE SAVASA IMPRE [ES]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0014] , [0 15] , [0 22]; figures 1-4 * | International search | [A]JP2001214139 (KASEI CO C I, et al); | [A]US6680097 (AMBERGER WERNER [DE], et al); | [A]WO2005092721 (FUJI SEAL INT INC [JP], et al); | [A]WO2011036347 (UPM RAFLATAC OY [FI], et al) |