EP2831644 - ANISOTROPY PROCESSING IN LOW ANGLE WELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | For:GB
NL
Schlumberger Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola 1110 / VG | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-89m 2514 JG The Hague / NL | [2016/39] |
Former [2015/06] | For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | ||
For:GB
NL
Schlumberger Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town Tortola, British Virgin Islands 1110 / VG | |||
For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-89m 2514 JG The Hague / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Jian 5431 Chesapeake Place Sugar Land, Texas 77479 / US | [2015/06] | Representative(s) | Li, Boxi, et al Schlumberger Cambridge Research Limited Intellectual Property Law High Cross Madingley Road Cambridge CB3 0EL / GB | [2015/06] | Application number, filing date | 13768460.1 | 27.03.2013 | [2016/39] | WO2013US34012 | Priority number, date | US201261616035P | 27.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261616035 P | US201313794568 | 11.03.2013 Original published format: US201313794568 | [2015/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013148774 | Date: | 03.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2831644 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2831644 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01V3/26, E21B47/0228, G01V3/28, G01V3/30 | [2016/32] | CPC: |
G01V3/30 (EP,US);
G01V3/28 (EP,US);
G01V3/26 (RU)
|
Former IPC [2015/06] | G01V3/26, E21B47/0228 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANISOTROPE VERARBEITUNG IN BOHRLÖCHERN MIT NIEDRIGEM WINKEL | [2015/06] | English: | ANISOTROPY PROCESSING IN LOW ANGLE WELLS | [2015/06] | French: | TRAITEMENT ANISOTROPIQUE DANS DES PUITS PEU INCLINÉS | [2015/06] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2014 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/06] | 08.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.03.2013 | AL | 28.09.2016 | AT | 28.09.2016 | BE | 28.09.2016 | CY | 28.09.2016 | CZ | 28.09.2016 | DK | 28.09.2016 | EE | 28.09.2016 | ES | 28.09.2016 | FI | 28.09.2016 | HR | 28.09.2016 | IT | 28.09.2016 | LT | 28.09.2016 | LV | 28.09.2016 | MC | 28.09.2016 | MK | 28.09.2016 | NL | 28.09.2016 | PL | 28.09.2016 | RO | 28.09.2016 | RS | 28.09.2016 | SE | 28.09.2016 | SI | 28.09.2016 | SK | 28.09.2016 | SM | 28.09.2016 | TR | 28.09.2016 | BG | 28.12.2016 | NO | 28.12.2016 | GR | 29.12.2016 | IS | 28.01.2017 | PT | 30.01.2017 | GB | 27.03.2017 | IE | 27.03.2017 | LU | 27.03.2017 | MT | 27.03.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | FR | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 27.03.2013 | |
AL | 28.09.2016 | ||
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MK | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
GB | 27.03.2017 | ||
IE | 27.03.2017 | ||
LU | 27.03.2017 | ||
MT | 27.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 27.03.2013 | |
AL | 28.09.2016 | ||
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
GB | 27.03.2017 | ||
IE | 27.03.2017 | ||
LU | 27.03.2017 | ||
MT | 27.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 27.03.2013 | |
AL | 28.09.2016 | ||
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
GB | 27.03.2017 | ||
IE | 27.03.2017 | ||
LU | 27.03.2017 | ||
MT | 27.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 28.09.2016 | |
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
GB | 27.03.2017 | ||
IE | 27.03.2017 | ||
LU | 27.03.2017 | ||
MT | 27.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
GB | 27.03.2017 | ||
IE | 27.03.2017 | ||
LU | 27.03.2017 | ||
MT | 27.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
GB | 27.03.2017 | ||
IE | 27.03.2017 | ||
LU | 27.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 27.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 28.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2004046561 (ITSKOVICH GREGORY [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0052] * [A] 11-15; | [X]US2005088181 (BARBER THOMAS D [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10-15 * figures 2,9 * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0068] *; | [X]EP2320251 (SCHLUMBERGER SERVICES PETROL [FR], et al) [X] 1-4,7-11,14,15 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0037] *; | [A]WO2011091216 (SCHLUMBERGER CA LTD [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0017] * * claims 3-7 ** figure 5 *; | [XA]US2011291855 (HOMAN DEAN M [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10-12,14 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0045] * * claims 14,18,20 * [A] 6-9,13,15 | International search | [A]US2007236221 (MERCHANT GULAMABBAS A [US], et al); | [A]US2009015261 (YANG JIAN [US], et al); | [Y]WO2011091216 (SCHLUMBERGER CA LTD [CA], et al); | [A]US2011199088 (BITTAR MICHAEL S [US]); | [X]US2011291855 (HOMAN DEAN M [US], et al) |