EP2832481 - MACHINING HEAD, HOLDER AND EXCHANGEABLE TIP CUTTING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2018 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Tool Engineering, Ltd. 3F, Seavans North 2-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0023 / JP | [2015/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAEDA, Katsutoshi c/o Yasu Plant Hitachi Tool Engineering Ltd. 35-2 Mikami Yasu-shi Shiga 520-2323 / JP | 02 /
BABA, Makoto c/o Yasu Plant Hitachi Tool Engineering Ltd. 35-2 Mikami Yasu-shi Shiga 520-2323 / JP | [2015/06] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2015/06] | Application number, filing date | 13769329.7 | 27.03.2013 | WO2013JP59002 | Priority number, date | JP20120077071 | 29.03.2012 Original published format: JP 2012077071 | [2015/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013146882 | Date: | 03.10.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2832481 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B23C5/00, B23C5/10, B23C5/22 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
B23C5/10 (EP,US);
B23C5/109 (US);
B23B31/1122 (EP,US);
B23C5/006 (US);
B23C5/22 (US);
B23C2210/02 (EP,US);
B23C2210/03 (EP,US);
B23C2240/32 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1906 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/06] | B23C5/00, B23C5/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/06] | Title | German: | BEARBEITUNGSKOPF, HALTER UND SCHNEIDWERKZEUG MIT AUSTAUSCHBARER SPITZE | [2015/06] | English: | MACHINING HEAD, HOLDER AND EXCHANGEABLE TIP CUTTING TOOL | [2015/06] | French: | TÊTE D'USINAGE, SUPPORT ET OUTIL DE COUPE À POINTE ÉCHANGEABLE | [2015/06] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2014 | Translation filed | 29.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2014 | Search fee paid | 29.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/06] | 10.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4799844 (CHUANG JO-YU [US]) [Y] 1,2 * column 2, line 61 - column 5, line 18 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]JPH08177831 (NIPPON KOKAN KK, et al) [A] 1,2* the whole document *; | [Y]EP1847345 (SANDVIK INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [SE]) [Y] 1,2 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0046] * * figures 1-10 *; | [A]WO2010143315 (OSG CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0041] * * figures 1-6 * | International search | [A]US2328602 (ANDRE BECHLER); | [A]US2606778 (MYHRE JOHN S); | [Y]US4799844 (CHUANG JO-YU [US]); | [A]JPH08177831 (NIPPON KOKAN KK, et al); | [A]WO03014584 (SUGIMURA NOBUYUKI [JP]); | [A]JP2007290120 (SANDVIK INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY); | [T]JP2010284752 (OSG CORP) | by applicant | JPH0477017U | JPH08177831 | JP2007290120 | JP2010284752 |