EP2832424 - SEPARATION MEMBRANE MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [2015/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKAI, Tetsuya c/o NGK INSULATORS LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Hideyuki c/o NGK INSULATORS LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 03 /
ICHIKAWA, Akimasa c/o NGK INSULATORS LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8530 / JP | 04 /
KINOSHITA, Naoto c/o NGK INSULATORS LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8530 / JP | [2015/06] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2015/06] | Application number, filing date | 13769402.2 | 01.02.2013 | WO2013JP52423 | Priority number, date | JP20120078272 | 29.03.2012 Original published format: JP 2012078272 | [2015/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013145857 | Date: | 03.10.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2832424 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B01D69/04, B01D69/10, B01D71/02, B01D71/64 | [2015/06] | CPC: |
B01D63/066 (EP,US);
B01D67/0044 (US);
B01D61/362 (EP,US);
B01D67/0002 (US);
B01D67/0067 (EP,US);
B01D71/64 (EP,US);
B01D2323/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/06] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE TRENNMEMBRAN | [2015/06] | English: | SEPARATION MEMBRANE MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2015/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE MEMBRANE DE SÉPARATION | [2015/06] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2014 | Translation filed | 01.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2014 | Search fee paid | 01.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/06] | 01.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/14] | 20.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.10.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0474424 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO PLC [GB]); | [X]EP2133136 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]); | [X]JP2010099559 (NGK INSULATORS LTD); | [X]JP2010110704 (NGK INSULATORS LTD) | International search | [Y]JP2010089000 (NGK INSULATORS LTD); | [Y]WO2011118252 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2003286018 | WO2008078442 | JP2010089000 |