EP2832700 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING HIGH-PURITY NICKEL SULFATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2019 Database last updated on 03.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Metal Mining Co., Ltd. 11-3, Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8716 / JP | [2015/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IDEGAMI Atsushi c/o Niihama Research Laboratories Sumitomo Metal Mining Co. Ltd. 17-5 Isoura-cho Niihama-shi Ehime 792-0002 / JP | 02 /
OZAKI Yoshitomo c/o Niihama Research Laboratories Sumitomo Metal Mining Co. Ltd. 17-5 Isoura-cho Niihama-shi Ehime 792-0002 / JP | 03 /
HEGURI Shin-ichi c/o Niihama Research Laboratories Sumitomo Metal Mining Co. Ltd. 17-5 Isoura-cho Niihama-shi Ehime 792-0002 / JP | 04 /
KUDOU Keiji c/o Niihama Research Laboratories Sumitomo Metal Mining Co. Ltd. 17-5 Isoura-cho Niihama-shi Ehime 792-0002 / JP | 05 /
OHARA Hideki c/o Niihama Research Laboratories Sumitomo Metal Mining Co. Ltd. 17-5 Isoura-cho Niihama-shi Ehime 792-0002 / JP | 06 /
MATSUMOTO Shinya c/o Niihama Research Laboratories Sumitomo Metal Mining Co. Ltd. 17-5 Isoura-cho Niihama-shi Ehime 792-0002 / JP | [2015/06] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2018/45] |
Former [2015/06] | Tranter, Andrew David Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13769798.3 | 13.02.2013 | [2018/45] | WO2013JP53406 | Priority number, date | JP20120077613 | 29.03.2012 Original published format: JP 2012077613 | [2015/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013145909 | Date: | 03.10.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2832700 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2832700 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C01G53/10, C22B3/26, C22B3/44, C22B23/00 | [2015/06] | CPC: |
C01G53/10 (EP,US);
C22B23/0469 (US);
C22B23/0461 (EP,US);
C01P2006/80 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HOCHREINEM NICKELSULFAT | [2015/06] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING HIGH-PURITY NICKEL SULFATE | [2015/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN SULFATE DE NICKEL DE HAUTE PURETÉ | [2015/06] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2014 | Translation filed | 28.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2014 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/06] | 10.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.08.2017 | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.02.2013 | AL | 07.11.2018 | AT | 07.11.2018 | CY | 07.11.2018 | CZ | 07.11.2018 | DK | 07.11.2018 | EE | 07.11.2018 | ES | 07.11.2018 | FI | 07.11.2018 | HR | 07.11.2018 | IT | 07.11.2018 | LT | 07.11.2018 | LV | 07.11.2018 | MC | 07.11.2018 | MK | 07.11.2018 | NL | 07.11.2018 | PL | 07.11.2018 | RO | 07.11.2018 | RS | 07.11.2018 | SE | 07.11.2018 | SI | 07.11.2018 | SK | 07.11.2018 | SM | 07.11.2018 | TR | 07.11.2018 | BG | 07.02.2019 | NO | 07.02.2019 | GR | 08.02.2019 | IE | 13.02.2019 | LU | 13.02.2019 | MT | 13.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | IS | 07.03.2019 | PT | 07.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 13.02.2013 | |
AL | 07.11.2018 | ||
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CY | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IE | 13.02.2019 | ||
LU | 13.02.2019 | ||
MT | 13.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CY | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IE | 13.02.2019 | ||
LU | 13.02.2019 | ||
MT | 13.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IE | 13.02.2019 | ||
LU | 13.02.2019 | ||
MT | 13.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IE | 13.02.2019 | ||
LU | 13.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IE | 13.02.2019 | ||
LU | 13.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IE | 13.02.2019 | ||
LU | 13.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
LU | 13.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
LU | 13.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
LU | 13.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 07.11.2018 | |
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 07.11.2018 | |
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 07.11.2018 | |
NO | 07.02.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3656937 (GANDON LOUIS, et al) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 9 - line 34; figure . * * column 2, line 61 - line 64 ** column 3, line 29 - line 35 * | International search | [A]JPS61106422 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO); | [A]JPH02172829 (SUMITOMO METAL IND, et al); | [A]JPH10218623 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO); | [A]JP2004516607 (OVONIC BATTERY CO., INC.); | [A]JP2009203082 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO) | by applicant | JPH1030135 | JPH10310437 | JP2005350766 |