EP2833698 - RESIN COMPOSITION FOR SEALING ORGANIC ELECTRO-LUMINESCENCE ELEMENT, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME, ADHESIVE FILM IN WHICH SAME RESIN COMPOSITION IS USED, GAS-BARRIER FILM, ORGANIC ELECTRO-LUMINESCENCE ELEMENT, AND ORGANIC ELECTRO-LUMINESCENCE PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/06] | For all designated states Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Toshihiro c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 02 /
HATTORI, Satoshi c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 03 /
MIEDA, Tetsuya c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 04 /
FUKUDA, Hideto c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 05 /
YAMAKAWA, Takanori c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 06 /
NAKAMURA, Toshimitsu c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [2015/06] | Representative(s) | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al Boeters & Lieck Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/06] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13769919.5 | 29.03.2013 | [2020/22] | WO2013JP59520 | Priority number, date | JP20120083117 | 30.03.2012 Original published format: JP 2012083117 | [2015/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013147156 | Date: | 03.10.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2833698 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2833698 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/04, H01L51/52, H05B33/10 | [2015/50] | CPC: |
H05B33/04 (EP,KR,US);
H10K50/844 (EP,KR,US);
H05B33/10 (EP,KR,US);
H10K50/00 (KR);
H10K50/8426 (EP,KR,US);
H10K50/846 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/1476 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/06] | H05B33/04, H01L51/50, H05B33/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VERSIEGELUNG EINES ORGANISCHEN ELEKTROLUMINESZENZ-ELEMENTS, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR, KLEBEFILM MIT DIESER HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG,, GASSPERRFILM, ORGANISCHES ELEKTROLUMINESZENZELEMENT UND ORGANISCHE ELEKTROLUMINESZENZTAFEL | [2015/06] | English: | RESIN COMPOSITION FOR SEALING ORGANIC ELECTRO-LUMINESCENCE ELEMENT, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME, ADHESIVE FILM IN WHICH SAME RESIN COMPOSITION IS USED, GAS-BARRIER FILM, ORGANIC ELECTRO-LUMINESCENCE ELEMENT, AND ORGANIC ELECTRO-LUMINESCENCE PANEL | [2015/06] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE POUR SCELLEMENT ÉTANCHE D'UN ÉLÉMENT À ÉLECTROLUMINESCENCE ORGANIQUE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, FILM ADHÉSIF DANS LEQUEL LA MÊME COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE EST UTILISÉE, FILM DE BARRIÈRE CONTRE LES GAZ, ÉLÉMENT À ÉLECTROLUMINESCENCE ORGANIQUE ET PANNEAU À ÉLECTROLUMINESCENCE ORGANIQUE | [2015/06] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2014 | Translation filed | 02.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2014 | Examination requested [2015/06] | 23.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2019 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.03.2013 | AL | 27.05.2020 | AT | 27.05.2020 | CY | 27.05.2020 | CZ | 27.05.2020 | DK | 27.05.2020 | EE | 27.05.2020 | ES | 27.05.2020 | FI | 27.05.2020 | HR | 27.05.2020 | IT | 27.05.2020 | LT | 27.05.2020 | LV | 27.05.2020 | MC | 27.05.2020 | MK | 27.05.2020 | MT | 27.05.2020 | NL | 27.05.2020 | PL | 27.05.2020 | RO | 27.05.2020 | RS | 27.05.2020 | SE | 27.05.2020 | SI | 27.05.2020 | SK | 27.05.2020 | SM | 27.05.2020 | BG | 27.08.2020 | NO | 27.08.2020 | GR | 28.08.2020 | IS | 27.09.2020 | PT | 28.09.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 29.03.2013 | |
AL | 27.05.2020 | ||
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CY | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
MK | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 29.03.2013 | |
AL | 27.05.2020 | ||
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CY | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 29.03.2013 | |
AL | 27.05.2020 | ||
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 27.05.2020 | |
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 27.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2001237064 (SEIKO INSTR INC) [X] 1,3,8-11 * paragraphs [0021] , [0022] , [0028] , [0031] , [0032]; figures 1,2; table 1 *; | [X]JP2006228519 (CANON KK) [X] 1,3,10,11* paragraphs [0020] , [0 23] - [0027] - [0042]; figure 5 *; | [XY]US2007184300 (YOKOSE EMIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-11 * paragraphs [0117] , [0118] , [0122] , [0125]; examples 4, 5 * * paragraphs [0102] , [0103]; figure 3 * * paragraphs [0062] , [0097] * [Y] 6,12; | [XY]JP2008115383 (NIPPON ZEON CO) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-11 * paragraphs [0139] , [0172]; figures 2,5 * * paragraphs [0211] , [0213]; examples 3,4 * * paragraphs [0207] - [0209] - [0225] * [Y] 6,12 | International search | [Y]JP2003297559 (EASTMAN KODAK CO); | [Y]JP2004143310 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [X]JP2005243556 (SHINETSU POLYMER CO); | [A]JP2006134888 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD); | [Y]JP2009259656 (TOYO INK MFG CO); | [Y]JP2010080293 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2004335208 | JP2007005107 | JP2009026648 |