EP2830663 - FULLY HUMAN ANTIBODIES THAT BIND TO VEGFR2 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.12.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.08.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sorrento Therapeutics, Inc. 4955 Directors Place San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2019/46] |
Former [2015/06] | For all designated states Sorrento Therapeutics, Inc. 6042 Comerstone Ct. West Suite B San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GASTWIRT, Randy 4083 Sequoia Street San Diego, CA 92109 / US | 02 /
ZHOU, Heyue 15732 Potomac Ridge Road San Diego, CA 92127 / US | 03 /
GRAY, John, Dixon 9878 Erma Road Apt 38 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 04 /
LU, Guodi 10771 Carmel Glen Trail Unit 50 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2016/25] |
Former [2015/12] | 01 /
GASTWIRT, Randy 4083 Sequoia Street San Diego, CA 92109 / US | ||
02 /
ZHOU, Heyue 10936 Via Banco San Diego, CA 92126 / US | |||
03 /
GRAY, John, Dixon 9878 Erma Road Apt 38 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
04 /
LU, Guodi 10771 Carmel Glen Trail Unit 50 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
Former [2015/06] | 01 /
GASTWIRT, Randy 4083 Sequoia Street San Diego, CA 92109 / US | ||
02 /
ZHOU, Heyue 10936 Via Banco San Diego, CA 92126 / US | |||
03 /
GRAY, John, Dixon 9878 Erma Road Apt 38 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
04 /
LU, Guodi 10771 Carmel Glen Trail San Diego, CA 92130 / US | Representative(s) | Lloyd, John Scott Script IP Limited Turnpike House 18 Bridge Street Frome Somerset BA11 1BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/06] | Sterling IP Orion House Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City AL7 1HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 13770063.9 | 30.03.2013 | [2019/06] | WO2013US34732 | Priority number, date | US201261618658P | 30.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261618658 P | [2015/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013149219 | Date: | 03.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2830663 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2830663 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.11.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, C07K16/22, C07K16/28 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
C07K16/2863 (EP);
C07K16/22 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (EP);
A61K2039/507 (EP);
C07K2317/14 (EP);
C07K2317/21 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2015/06] | A61K39/395 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VOLLSTÄNDIG HUMANE, AN VEGFR2 BINDENDE ANTIKÖRPER | [2015/06] | English: | FULLY HUMAN ANTIBODIES THAT BIND TO VEGFR2 | [2015/06] | French: | ANTICORPS COMPLÈTEMENT HUMAINS QUI SE LIENT À VEGFR2 | [2015/06] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 17.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/06] | 17.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/06] | 09.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2015/06] | 09.12.2014 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 17.12.2014 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 18.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.12.2017 | Opposition(s) | 07.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.03.2013 | AL | 06.02.2019 | AT | 06.02.2019 | CY | 06.02.2019 | CZ | 06.02.2019 | DK | 06.02.2019 | EE | 06.02.2019 | ES | 06.02.2019 | FI | 06.02.2019 | HR | 06.02.2019 | IT | 06.02.2019 | LT | 06.02.2019 | LV | 06.02.2019 | MC | 06.02.2019 | MK | 06.02.2019 | PL | 06.02.2019 | RO | 06.02.2019 | RS | 06.02.2019 | SE | 06.02.2019 | SI | 06.02.2019 | SK | 06.02.2019 | SM | 06.02.2019 | TR | 06.02.2019 | IE | 30.03.2019 | LU | 30.03.2019 | MT | 30.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | BG | 06.05.2019 | NO | 06.05.2019 | GR | 07.05.2019 | IS | 06.06.2019 | PT | 06.06.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 30.03.2013 | |
AL | 06.02.2019 | ||
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IE | 30.03.2019 | ||
LU | 30.03.2019 | ||
MT | 30.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IE | 30.03.2019 | ||
LU | 30.03.2019 | ||
MT | 30.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IE | 30.03.2019 | ||
LU | 30.03.2019 | ||
MT | 30.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IE | 30.03.2019 | ||
LU | 30.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
IE | 30.03.2019 | ||
LU | 30.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
IE | 30.03.2019 | ||
LU | 30.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
AT | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
LU | 30.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
LU | 30.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
LU | 30.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 06.02.2019 | |
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 06.02.2019 | |
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0230984 (UAB RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US]) [A] 1-12* abstract *; | [A]WO2009060198 (PEREGRINE PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 39, line 9 - page 66, line 31 *; | [I] - ZHANG HAIFAN ET AL, "Inhibition of both the autocrine and the paracrine growth of human leukemia with a fully human antibody directed against vascular endothelial growth factor receptor 2", LEUKEMIA AND LYMPHOMA, INFORMA HEALTHCARE, US, (20040901), vol. 45, no. 9, doi:10.1080/10428190410001712225, ISSN 1042-8194, pages 1887 - 1897, XP008096902 [I] 1-12 * abstract * * page 1887 - page 1889; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/10428190410001712225 | [A] - MIAO H Q ET AL, "Potent neutralization of VEGF biological activities with a fully human antibody Fab fragment directed against VEGF receptor 2", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, vol. 345, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.BBRC.2006.04.119, ISSN 0006-291X, (20060623), pages 438 - 445, (20060623), XP024925104 [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 439 - page 440; figure 1a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2006.04.119 | [A] - ZHU Z ET AL, "Inhibition of human leukemia in an animal model with human antibodies directed against vascular endothelial growth factor receptor 2. Correlation between antibody affinity and biological activity", LEUKEMIA, MACMILLAN PRESS LTD, US, (20030301), vol. 17, no. 3, doi:10.1038/SJ.LEU.2402831, ISSN 0887-6924, pages 604 - 611, XP002508501 [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 604 - page 610; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.leu.2402831 | [A] - JIMENEZ XENIA ET AL, "A recombinant, fully human, bispecific antibody neutralizes the biological activities mediated by both vascular endothelial growth factor receptors 2 and 3.", MOLECULAR CANCER THERAPEUTICS MAR 2005, (200503), vol. 4, no. 3, ISSN 1535-7163, pages 427 - 434, XP008178943 [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 427 - page 429; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1535-7163.MCT-04-0261 | International search | [A]WO2006017538 (DYAX CORP [US], et al); | [A]US2009306348 (GOLDSTEIN JOEL [US], et al); | [A]US2011038874 (TONG JIE [US], et al); | [A] - WICKI ET AL., "Targeting Tumor-Associated Endothelial Cells: Anti-VEGFR2 Immunoliposomes Mediate Tumor Vessel Disruption and Inhibit Tumor Growth", CLIN. CANCER RES., (20120115), vol. 18, no. 2, XP055162153 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-11-1102 | by applicant | US3817827 | US3850752 | US3901654 | US4002531 | US4098876 | US4179337 | US4301144 | US4496689 | US4640835 | US4670417 | US4791192 | US4816567 | US4946778 | US5092885 | EP0473084 | US5112946 | US5192744 | US5202352 | WO9401451 | US5281698 | WO9410308 | US5382657 | US5582996 | US5807706 | US5824784 | US5877293 | US5886152 | US5932462 | US5959083 | US6010902 | WO0009560 | US6054297 | US2002044921 | US6395718 | US6462075 | US6465431 | US6475784 | US6482802 | US6482810 | US6500431 | US6500924 | US6518298 | US6521439 | US6524583 | US6525019 | US6538103 | US6544758 | US6544947 | US6548477 | US6559126 | US6569845 | US6573256 | US6696245 | US6846634 | - FOLKMAN; KLAGSBRUN, SCIENCE, (1987), vol. 235, pages 442 - 447 | - KERBEL, CARCINOGENESIS, (2000), vol. 21, pages 505 - 515 | - LYNDEN ET AL., NAT. MED., (2001), vol. 7, pages 1194 - 1201 | - HOLASH ET AL., SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 284, pages 1994 - 1998 | - PRESTA ET AL., CANCER RES., (1997), vol. 57, pages 4593 - 4599 | - TISCHER ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM, (1991), vol. 266, pages 11947 - 11954 | - JAIN ET AL., NAT. REV. CANCER, (2002), vol. 2, pages 266 - 276 | - LYDEN ET AL., NATURE MEDICINE, (2001), vol. 7, page 1194 | - JACOB ET AL., EXP. PATHOL., (1978), vol. 15, page 1234 | - BAE ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2000), vol. 275, page 13588 | - MAYFIELD ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (2003), vol. 100, no. 2, pages 438 - 42 | - SINCLAIR ET AL., PROTEIN EXPR. PURIF., (2002), pages 96 - 105 | - CONNELL N D, CURR. OPIN. BIOTECHNOL., (2001), vol. 12, no. 5, pages 446 - 9 | - MAKRIDES ET AL., MICROBIOL. REV, (1996), vol. 60, no. 3, pages 512 - 38 | - SHARP ET AL., YEAST, (1991), vol. 7, no. 7, pages 657 - 78 | - SAMBROOK ET AL., Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, 2 ed.,, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1989), vol. 1-3 | - LUCKOW; SUMMERS, BIOLTECHNOLOGY, (1988), vol. 6, page 47 | - RAJU ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (20001231), vol. 40, no. 30, pages 8868 - 76 | - SANDLER; KARO, Polymer Synthesis, ACADEMIC PRESS, vol. 3, pages 138 - 161 | - MONFARDINI ET AL., BIOCONJUGATE CHEM., (1995), vol. 6, pages 62 - 69 | - PEPINSKY ET AL., JPET, (2001), vol. 297, page 1059 | - WIEDER ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1979), vol. 254, page 12579 | - CHAMOW ET AL., BIOCONJUGATE CHEM., (1994), vol. 5, page 133 | - CAZALIS ET AL., BIOCONJUG. CHEM, (2004), vol. 15, no. 5, pages 1005 - 1009 | - MCLEOD ET AL., INVEST. OPHTHALMOL. VIS. SCI., (2002), vol. 43, no. 2, pages 474 - 82 | - WATANABE ET AL., EXP. DERMATOL., (2004), vol. 13, no. 11, pages 671 - 81 | - YOSHIJI ET AL., GUT., (2003), vol. 52, no. 9, pages 1347 - 54 | - VERHEUL ET AL., ONCOLOGIST, (2000), vol. 5, no. 1, pages 45 - 50 | - BOLDICKE ET AL., STEM CELLS, (2001), vol. 19, no. 1, pages 24 - 36 | - BLOOD ET AL., BIOCH. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1990), vol. 1032, pages 89 - 118 | - MOSES ET AL., SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 248, pages 1408 - 1410 | - INGBER ET AL., LAB. INVEST., (1988), vol. 59, pages 44 - 51 | - KORNDORFER ET AL., PROTEINS: STRUCTURE, FUNCTION, AND BIOINFORMATICS, (2003), vol. 53, no. 1, pages 121 - 129 | - ROQUE ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. PROG., (2004), vol. 20, pages 639 - 654 | - LEFRANC ET AL., DEV. COMP. IMMUNOL., (2005), vol. 29, pages 185 - 203 | - HONEGGER; PLUCKTHUN, J. MOL. BIOL., (2001), vol. 309, no. 3, pages 657 - 670 | - BIRD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 423 - 26 | - HUSTON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 83 | - HOLLIGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 48 | - POLJAK ET AL., STRUCTURE, (1994), vol. 2, pages 1121 - 23 | - LEFRANC ET AL., DEV. COMP. IMMUNOL, (2005), vol. 29, pages 185 - 203 | - GLUZMAN ET AL., CELL, (1981), vol. 23, page 175 | - RASMUSSEN ET AL., CYTOTECHNOLOGY, (1998), vol. 28, page 31 | - URLAUB ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, pages 4216 - 20 | - MCMAHAN ET AL., EMBO J., (1991), vol. 10, page 2821 | - LANDSCHULZ ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, page 1759 | - HOPPE ET AL., FEBS LETTERS, (1994), vol. 344, page 191 | - FANSLOW ET AL., SEMIN. IMMUNOL, (1994), vol. 6, pages 267 - 78 | - KORTT ET AL., PROT. ENG, (1997), vol. 10, page 423 | - KORTT ET AL., BIOMOL. ENG., (2001), vol. 18, pages 95 - 108 | - KRIANGKUM ET AL., BIOMOL. ENG, (2001), vol. 18, pages 31 - 40 | - BIRD, SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, page 423 | - HUSTON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, page 5879 | - WARD ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 334, page 544 | - DE GRAAF ET AL., METHODS MOL. BIOL., (2002), vol. 178, pages 379 - 87 | - LANTTO ET AL., METHODS MOL. BIOL, (2002), vol. 178, pages 303 - 16 | - BLOOM ET AL., PROTEIN SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 6, page 407 | - MILSTEIN ET AL., NATURE, (1983), vol. 305, page 537 | - BRENNAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, page 81 | - GLENNIE ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1987), vol. 139, page 2367 | - KOSTELNY ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 148, page 1547 |