Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.03.2017 | Change - priority | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] |
18.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
25.07.2016 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
14.03.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.02.2016 | Change - representative | |
20.11.2015 | Change - classification | published on 23.12.2015 [2015/52] |
20.11.2015 | Change - classification | published on 23.12.2015 [2015/52] |
20.11.2015 | Change - date of supplementary search report | published on 23.12.2015 [2015/52] |
03.07.2015 | Change - applicant | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
29.05.2015 | Change - extension states | published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] |
13.03.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.01.2015 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 04.02.2015 [2015/06] |
02.01.2015 | Request for examination filed | published on 04.02.2015 [2015/06] |
17.10.2014 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.10.2014 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.09.2014 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant | |
23.09.2014 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.08.2014 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.10.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.10.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication |