EP2832777 - POLYMER SHEET, BACK PROTECTIVE SHEET FOR SOLAR CELL, AND SOLAR CELL MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/06] | POLYMER SHEET, REVERSE-SIDE PROTECTIVE SHEET FOR SOLAR CELL, AND SOLAR CELL MODULE | ||
[2020/23] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/06] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEGAMI Ryuta c/o FUJIFILM CORPORATION 200 Ohnakazato Fujinomiya-shi Shizuoka 418-8666 / JP | [2015/06] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/06] | Application number, filing date | 13770385.6 | 21.03.2013 | WO2013JP58031 | Priority number, date | JP20120073657 | 28.03.2012 Original published format: JP 2012073657 | [2015/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013146516 | Date: | 03.10.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2832777 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/18, B32B27/00, B32B27/20, C08K3/04, C08K3/22, C08L67/02, H01L31/049 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
H01L31/049 (EP,US);
B32B27/20 (EP,US);
C08J5/18 (EP,US);
C08K3/04 (EP,US);
C08K3/22 (EP,US);
B32B2264/102 (EP,US);
B32B2264/108 (EP,US);
B32B2457/12 (EP,US);
C08J2367/02 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/06] | C08J5/18, B32B27/00, B32B27/20, C08K3/04, C08K3/22, C08L67/02, H01L31/042 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/06] | Title | German: | POLYMERFOLIE, RÜCKSEITENSCHUTZFOLIE FÜR SOLARZELLEN UND SOLARZELLENMODUL | [2015/06] | English: | POLYMER SHEET, BACK PROTECTIVE SHEET FOR SOLAR CELL, AND SOLAR CELL MODULE | [2020/23] | French: | FEUILLE DE POLYMÈRE, FEUILLE PROTECTRICE DE CÔTÉ ARRIÈRE POUR CELLULE SOLAIRE ET MODULE DE CELLULE SOLAIRE | [2020/23] |
Former [2015/06] | POLYMER SHEET, REVERSE-SIDE PROTECTIVE SHEET FOR SOLAR CELL, AND SOLAR CELL MODULE | ||
Former [2015/06] | FEUILLE DE POLYMÈRE, FEUILLE PROTECTRICE DE CÔTÉ ENVERS POUR CELLULE SOLAIRE ET MODULE DE CELLULE SOLAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2014 | Translation filed | 23.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2014 | Search fee paid | 23.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/06] | 14.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/08] | 12.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012055539 (KIM TAEYOON [KR], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0104]; figure 1 *; | [X]EP1995789 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0030]; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US5513040 (YANG PETER Y [US]) [X] 1-10 * column 5, line 33 - column 13, line 19; figures 1,5 * | International search | [X]JPH10508263 (DEPOSITION TECHNOLOGY, INC.); | [X]JP2009216734 (ACHILLES CORP); | [X]WO2010047391 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP], et al); | [X]JP2000052639 (UNION CHEMICAR CO LTD); | [X]JP2008039960 (OIKE KOGYO KK); | [A]JP2011510849 (ARKEMA FRANCE); | [A]JP2009212432 (TEIJIN DUPONT FILMS JAPAN LTD) | by applicant | JP2010519742 | JP2007150084 | JP2006270025 | JP2011029397 | JP2011165967 | JP2011184488 | JPH0830119B | JP2543624B | JP3335683B | JP3717380B | JP3897756B | JP3962226B | JP3979866B | JP3996871B | JP4000867B | JP4053837B | JP4127119B | JP4134710B | JP4159154B | JP4269704B | JP4313538B | JP2621563B | JP3121876B | JP3136774B | JP3603585B | JP3616522B | JP3617340B | JP3680523B | JP3717392B | JP4167159B | JP2009052011 | JP2003231722 | JP2002020409 | JPH09194538 | JP2009132887 | JP2009235278 | JP2011208125 | - H.A. PHOL, ANAL. CHEM., (1954), vol. 26, page 2145 |