EP2903968 - INHIBITORS OF HISTONE DEMETHYLASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gilead Sciences, Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [2016/38] |
Former [2015/33] | For all designated states Epitherapeutics ApS Ole Maaløes Vej 3 2200 Copenhagen N / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LABELLE, Marc 10 Melbourne Way Basking Ridge, New Jersey 07920 / US | 02 /
BOESEN, Thomas Lipkesvey 25 2.tv. DK-2100 København Ø / DK | 03 /
MEHROTRA, Mukund 711-1325 Taylor Avenue Winnipeg, Manitoba R3M 2K7 / CA | 04 /
KHAN, Qasim 609-1305 Taylor Avenue Winnipeg, Manitoba R3M 2K7 / CA | 05 /
ULLAH, Farman 311-1325 Taylor Avenue Winnipeg, Manitoba R3M 2K7 / CA | [2015/33] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2016/49] |
Former [2015/33] | Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13770928.3 | 01.10.2013 | [2015/33] | WO2013EP70457 | Priority number, date | DK20120000599 | 02.10.2012 Original published format: DK 201200599 | US201261708806P | 02.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261708806 P | DK20130070112 | 27.02.2013 Original published format: DK 201370112 | US201361770050P | 27.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361770050 P | [2015/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014053491 | Date: | 10.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2903968 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2903968 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/79, C07D401/12, C07D405/12, C07D413/12, A61K31/4418, A61P35/00 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
C07D213/79 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/44 (EP,US);
A61K31/443 (EP,US);
A61K31/4439 (EP,US);
A61K31/444 (EP,US);
A61K31/4545 (EP,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D401/06 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,CN,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] | Extension states | BA | 20.04.2015 | ME | 20.04.2015 | Title | German: | INHIBITOREN VON HISTONDEMETHYLASEN | [2015/33] | English: | INHIBITORS OF HISTONE DEMETHYLASES | [2015/33] | French: | INHIBITEURS D'HISTONE DÉMÉTHYLASES | [2015/33] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/33] | 30.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15200672.2 / EP3023415 | EP16186022.6 / EP3150582 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2017/13] |
Former [2017/12] | LV | 07.12.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2010056549 (SIRTRIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9,11-13 * See, for instance, compounds 60 and 61, respectively on pages 104 and 105 *; | [A]WO2012007007 (EPITHERAPEUTICS APS [DK], et al) [A] 1-16* See claim 1 *; | [X]CN102585150 (UNIV JIAXING, et al) [X] 1-3,9 * See, for instance, paragraphs 11-12, page 3 *; | [XP]EP2578569 (ASKA PHARM CO LTD [JP]) [XP] 1,2,9,11-13 * See, for instance, the compounds on pages 50, 54-55, 57, 61, 67, 71, 77, 79, 79, 81, 83, 85, 97, 100, 105, 112, 145, 149, 151 and 153 * |