EP2900632 - PREPARATION OF AN INTERMEDIATE COMPOUND OF IOFORMINOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE HEALTHCARE AS Nycoveien 1 0485 Oslo / NO | [2019/42] |
Former [2019/24] | For all designated states GE HEALTHCARE AS P.O. Box 4220 Nydalen Nycoveien 1-2 0401 Oslo / NO | ||
Former [2015/32] | For all designated states GE HEALTHCARE AS Nycoveien 1-2 PO Box 4220 Nydalen 0401 Oslo / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THANING, Mikkel Ge Healthcare As P.O. Box 4220 Nydalen Nycoveien 1-2 N-0401 Oslo / NO | 02 /
OLSSON, Andreas Ge Healthcare As P.O. Box 4220 Nydalen Nycoveien 1-2 N-0401 Oslo / NO | 03 /
GLOGARD, Christian Ge Healthcare As P.O. Box 4220 Nydalen Nycoveien 1-2 N-0401 Oslo / NO | [2015/32] | Representative(s) | Bannan, Sally GE Healthcare Limited Intellectual Property Pollards Wood Nightingales Lane Chalfont St.Giles Buckinghamshire HP8 4SP / GB | [2019/44] |
Former [2015/32] | Bannan, Sally GE Healthcare Limited Intellectual Property Pollards Wood Nightingales Lane, Chalfont St Giles Buckinghamshire HP8 4SP / GB | Application number, filing date | 13771008.3 | 17.09.2013 | [2019/44] | WO2013US60081 | Priority number, date | NO20120001102 | 27.09.2012 Original published format: NO 20121102 | [2015/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014052091 | Date: | 03.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2900632 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2900632 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07C231/02, C07C231/14, C07C231/24, C07C237/46 | [2019/21] | CPC: |
C07C231/02 (EP,RU,US);
C07C231/14 (RU,US);
C07C231/24 (EP,RU,US);
C07C237/46 (RU,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C231/02, C07C237/46 (EP,US);
C07C231/24, C07C237/46 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2015/32] | C07C231/24, C07C237/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG EINER ZWISCHENPRODUKTVERBINDUNG VON IOFORMINOL | [2015/32] | English: | PREPARATION OF AN INTERMEDIATE COMPOUND OF IOFORMINOL | [2015/32] | French: | PRÉPARATION D'UN COMPOSÉ INTERMÉDIAIRE D'IOFORMINOL | [2015/32] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/32] | 30.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.08.2017 | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.09.2013 | AL | 30.10.2019 | AT | 30.10.2019 | CY | 30.10.2019 | CZ | 30.10.2019 | DK | 30.10.2019 | EE | 30.10.2019 | ES | 30.10.2019 | FI | 30.10.2019 | HR | 30.10.2019 | IT | 30.10.2019 | LT | 30.10.2019 | LV | 30.10.2019 | MC | 30.10.2019 | MK | 30.10.2019 | MT | 30.10.2019 | NL | 30.10.2019 | PL | 30.10.2019 | RO | 30.10.2019 | RS | 30.10.2019 | SE | 30.10.2019 | SI | 30.10.2019 | SK | 30.10.2019 | SM | 30.10.2019 | TR | 30.10.2019 | BG | 30.01.2020 | NO | 30.01.2020 | GR | 31.01.2020 | IS | 29.02.2020 | PT | 02.03.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 17.09.2013 | |
AL | 30.10.2019 | ||
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CY | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
MT | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
TR | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
TR | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | ES | 30.10.2019 | |
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | ES | 30.10.2019 | |
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 30.10.2019 | |
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 30.01.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO0047549 (NYCOMED IMAGING AS [NO], et al); | [Y]WO2006016815 (AMERSHAM HEALTH AS [NO], et al); | [X]WO2009008734 (GE HEALTHCARE AS [NO], et al); | by applicant | EP0108638 | WO9823296 | WO2006016815 | WO2009008734 |