EP2903422 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ORGANISING AT LEAST ONE OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hammelbacher, Stephan Tuften 13 83684 Tegernsee / DE | [2020/41] |
Former [2015/33] | For all designated states Hammelbacher, Stephan Sachsenkamer Strasse 33A 83677 Reichersbeuern / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/33] | Representative(s) | Beckord & Niedlich Patentanwälte PartG mbB Marktplatz 17 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | [2021/10] |
Former [2015/33] | Beckord & Niedlich Marktplatz 17 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | Application number, filing date | 13771135.4 | 30.09.2013 | [2015/33] | WO2013EP70329 | Priority number, date | DE201210109320 | 01.10.2012 Original published format: DE102012109320 | DE201210109907 | 17.10.2012 Original published format: DE102012109907 | DE201210110291 | 26.10.2012 Original published format: DE102012110291 | [2015/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014053436 | Date: | 10.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2903422 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2903422 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A01K1/03, G06Q10/08, // A01G7/00 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
G06Q10/087 (EP,US);
A01K1/031 (EP,US);
A01G7/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/33] | A01K1/03, G06Q10/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ORGANISATION WENIGSTENS EINES OBJEKTS | [2015/33] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ORGANISING AT LEAST ONE OBJECT | [2015/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR L'ORGANISATION D'AU MOINS UN OBJET | [2015/33] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/33] | 20.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.12.2017 | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.09.2013 | AL | 10.03.2021 | CY | 10.03.2021 | CZ | 10.03.2021 | DK | 10.03.2021 | EE | 10.03.2021 | ES | 10.03.2021 | FI | 10.03.2021 | HR | 10.03.2021 | IT | 10.03.2021 | LT | 10.03.2021 | LV | 10.03.2021 | MC | 10.03.2021 | MK | 10.03.2021 | MT | 10.03.2021 | NL | 10.03.2021 | PL | 10.03.2021 | RO | 10.03.2021 | RS | 10.03.2021 | SE | 10.03.2021 | SI | 10.03.2021 | SK | 10.03.2021 | SM | 10.03.2021 | BG | 10.06.2021 | NO | 10.06.2021 | GR | 11.06.2021 | IS | 10.07.2021 | PT | 12.07.2021 | LU | 30.09.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 30.09.2013 | |
AL | 10.03.2021 | ||
CY | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
MK | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
LU | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 30.09.2013 | |
AL | 10.03.2021 | ||
CY | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
LU | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 30.09.2013 | |
AL | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
LU | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
LU | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
IT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | CZ | 10.03.2021 | |
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | CZ | 10.03.2021 | |
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
ES | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | CZ | 10.03.2021 | |
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
PT | 12.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | CZ | 10.03.2021 | |
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2006071773 (AHMED OSMAN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6 * paragraphs [0024] - [0046] * * figures 1-2 * [A] 12-15 [I] 7-11; | [XI]WO2006069347 (OCEANEERING INT INC [US]) [X] 1-4,6,9 * paragraphs [0014] - [0022] - [0027] - [0036] * * figures 1-7 *[I] 5,7,8,10,11; | [XAI]US2009293815 (COIRO SR MICHAEL A [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,9-11 * paragraphs [0005] , [0020] - [0029] * * figures 1-12 * [A] 12-15 [I] 7,8; | [XI]US2010121480 (STELZER PETER [AT], et al) [X] 12-14 * paragraphs [0006] - [0022] - [0 30] - [0033] * * figures 1-2 * [I] 15 |