Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20150002528U | Global Dossier | 29.06.2015 | U | Priority number | Date | WO2013US60914 | 20.09.2013 | US201213681138 | 19.11.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101737284B | Global Dossier | 17.05.2017 | B1 | KR20160075642 | 29.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013US60914 | 20.09.2013 | US201213681138 | 19.11.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3200838U | Global Dossier | 12.11.2015 | U | Priority number | Date | WO2013US60914 | 20.09.2013 | US201213681138 | 19.11.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2907194 | Global Dossier | 24.04.2019 | B1 | EP2907194 | 19.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US60914 | 20.09.2013 | US201213681138 | 19.11.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN204760528U | 11.11.2015 | U | Priority number | Date | WO2013US60914 | 20.09.2013 | US201213681138 | 19.11.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE212013000233U | 26.06.2015 | U1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US60914 | 20.09.2013 | US201213681138 | 19.11.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014077951 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213681138 | 19.11.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9793616 | Global Dossier | 17.10.2017 | B2 | US2014139380 | 22.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213681138 | 19.11.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI526010B | 11.03.2016 | B | TW201429181 | 16.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201213681138 | 19.11.2012 |