EP2893120 - A JOINT ELEMENT, A CASING STREAM COMPRISING SUCH A JOINT ELEMENT AND A METHOD FOR COMPENSATING FOR FORCES DUE TO THERMAL EFFECTS IN A CASING STRING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.04.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vanguard Oil Tools&Services LLC P.O. Box: 732 Azaiba 130 Muscat / OM | [2015/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOVIKNES, Borre Fosseveien 45b 6770 Nordfjordeid / NO | 02 /
JOHANSSON, Mats Storgatan 3A 982 31 Gällivare / SE | 03 /
BARTON, Len Annaberg 119 5524 Annaberg Lungotz / AT | [2017/39] |
Former [2015/29] | 01 /
LOVIKNES, Borre Fosseveien 45b 6770 Nordfjordeid / NO | ||
02 /
JOHANSSON, Mats Storgatan 3A 982 31 Gällivare / SE | |||
03 /
BARTON, Len 50 West Park Inverbervie Angus Central Scotland DD5 3UB / GB | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/29] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 13773365.5 | 22.07.2013 | [2017/39] | WO2013IB56008 | Priority number, date | OM1562012P | 22.07.2012 Original published format: OM 1562012 P | SE20120051340 | 27.11.2012 Original published format: SE 1251340 | [2015/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014016758 | Date: | 30.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2893120 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.01.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2893120 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E21B17/07 | [2015/29] | CPC: |
E21B17/08 (EP,US);
E21B17/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSELEMENT, GEHÄUSESTRANG MIT SOLCH EINEM VERBINDUNGSELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZUR KOMPENSATION VON DURCH THERMISCHE EFFEKTE HERVORGERUFENEN KRÄFTEN IN EINEM GEHÄUSESTRANG | [2015/29] | English: | A JOINT ELEMENT, A CASING STREAM COMPRISING SUCH A JOINT ELEMENT AND A METHOD FOR COMPENSATING FOR FORCES DUE TO THERMAL EFFECTS IN A CASING STRING | [2015/29] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE RACCORD, TRAIN D'ENVELOPPE COMPRENANT UN TEL ÉLÉMENT DE RACCORD ET PROCÉDÉ POUR COMPENSER DES FORCES DUES À DES EFFETS THERMIQUES DANS UN TRAIN DE TIGES D'ENVELOPPE | [2015/29] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/29] | 11.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.07.2013 | AT | 27.09.2017 | CY | 27.09.2017 | CZ | 27.09.2017 | DK | 27.09.2017 | EE | 27.09.2017 | ES | 27.09.2017 | FI | 27.09.2017 | HR | 27.09.2017 | LT | 27.09.2017 | LV | 27.09.2017 | MC | 27.09.2017 | MK | 27.09.2017 | NL | 27.09.2017 | PL | 27.09.2017 | RS | 27.09.2017 | SE | 27.09.2017 | SI | 27.09.2017 | SK | 27.09.2017 | SM | 27.09.2017 | BG | 27.12.2017 | NO | 27.12.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 22.07.2013 | |
AT | 27.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
SM | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RS | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 27.09.2017 | |
NO | 27.12.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5018581 (HALL L D [US]) [X] 1,4,6,11,13,14 * abstract * * figures 2-3 * * column 3, lines 33-36 * * column 4, paragraph 1 * * column 4, lines 33-35 * * column 5, lines 18-22 *[I] 2,3,5,7-10,12,15; | [XI]US2009283256 (LANGESLAG RENE [CA]) [X] 1,4,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0012]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] * [I] 2,3,5-12,14,15 |