EP2885738 - A SECURE MECHANISM TO SWITCH BETWEEN DIFFERENT DOMAINS OF OPERATION IN A DATA PROCESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARM Limited 110 Fulbourn Road Cherry Hinton Cambridge CB1 9NJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/26] | For all designated states ARM Limited 110 Fulbourn Road Cherry Hinton Cambridge CB1 9NJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROCUTT, Thomas Christopher c/o ARM Limited 110 Fulbourn Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB1 9NJ / GB | 02 /
BILES, Stuart David c/o ARM Limited 110 Fulbourn Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB1 9NJ / GB | 03 /
CRASKE, Simon John c/o ARM Limited 110 Fulbourn Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB1 9NJ / GB | [2015/26] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/43] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2015/26] | Berryman, Robert Jan D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 13773826.6 | 17.09.2013 | [2016/43] | WO2013GB52423 | Priority number, date | GB20120017531 | 01.10.2012 Original published format: GB 201217531 | GB20130013869 | 02.08.2013 Original published format: GB 201313869 | [2015/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014053806 | Date: | 10.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2885738 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2885738 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/52, G06F21/55, G06F21/74 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
G06F21/52 (EP,US);
G06F12/1458 (GB);
G06F21/629 (US);
G06F21/50 (US);
G06F21/54 (US);
G06F21/554 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/26] | G06F21/54 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERER MECHANISMUS ZUM UMSCHALTEN ZWISCHEN VERSCHIEDENEN BETRIEBSDOMÄNEN IN EINEM DATENPROZESSOR | [2015/26] | English: | A SECURE MECHANISM TO SWITCH BETWEEN DIFFERENT DOMAINS OF OPERATION IN A DATA PROCESSOR | [2015/26] | French: | MÉCANISME SÉCURISÉ POUR ALTERNER ENTRE DIFFÉRENTS DOMAINES DE FONCTIONNEMENT DANS UN DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES | [2015/26] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/26] | 27.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 06.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.09.2013 | AL | 26.10.2016 | AT | 26.10.2016 | BE | 26.10.2016 | CY | 26.10.2016 | CZ | 26.10.2016 | DK | 26.10.2016 | EE | 26.10.2016 | ES | 26.10.2016 | FI | 26.10.2016 | HR | 26.10.2016 | IT | 26.10.2016 | LT | 26.10.2016 | LV | 26.10.2016 | MC | 26.10.2016 | MK | 26.10.2016 | NL | 26.10.2016 | PL | 26.10.2016 | RO | 26.10.2016 | RS | 26.10.2016 | SE | 26.10.2016 | SI | 26.10.2016 | SK | 26.10.2016 | SM | 26.10.2016 | TR | 26.10.2016 | BG | 26.01.2017 | NO | 26.01.2017 | GR | 27.01.2017 | IS | 26.02.2017 | PT | 27.02.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 17.09.2013 | |
AT | 26.10.2016 | ||
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CY | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
MK | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
TR | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 17.09.2013 | |
AT | 26.10.2016 | ||
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CY | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
MK | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 17.09.2013 | |
AT | 26.10.2016 | ||
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CY | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 17.09.2013 | |
AT | 26.10.2016 | ||
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
MC | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SI | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
BG | 26.01.2017 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
IT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
SM | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
EE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RO | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
SK | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
DK | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 26.10.2016 | |
BE | 26.10.2016 | ||
ES | 26.10.2016 | ||
FI | 26.10.2016 | ||
HR | 26.10.2016 | ||
LT | 26.10.2016 | ||
LV | 26.10.2016 | ||
NL | 26.10.2016 | ||
PL | 26.10.2016 | ||
RS | 26.10.2016 | ||
SE | 26.10.2016 | ||
NO | 26.01.2017 | ||
GR | 27.01.2017 | ||
IS | 26.02.2017 | ||
PT | 27.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 26.10.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]GB2448149 (ADVANCED RISC MACH LTD [GB]) [X] 1-5,19-21 * the whole document * [Y] 6-12 [I] 13-18,22,23; | [Y] - JOSEP TORRELLAS ET AL, "Architectural support for software-based protection", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1ST WORKSHOP ON ARCHITECTURAL AND SYSTEM SUPPORT FOR IMPROVING SOFTWARE DEPENDABILITY , ASID '06, New York, New York, USA, (20061021), doi:10.1145/1181309.1181316, ISBN 978-1-59-593576-2, pages 42 - 51, XP055094732 [Y] 6-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1181309.1181316 | by applicant | US8010772 |