17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
10.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
22.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] |
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
29.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
22.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
22.09.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
15.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
11.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
04.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] |
21.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] |
14.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] |
07.07.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] |
30.06.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
16.06.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.2017 [2017/29] |
26.05.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] |
17.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
14.10.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] |
10.10.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.09.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
23.09.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
21.09.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
26.05.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.05.2016 |
Change - German title |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
06.05.2016 |
Change - English title |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
04.12.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 06.01.2016 [2016/01] |
09.11.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
10.10.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.07.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] |
10.07.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] |
01.05.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.04.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.04.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
05.04.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.03.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.05.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.04.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.11.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.10.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|