Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9945822 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2018 | B2 | US2015300999 | 22.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1259339 | 02.10.2012 | WO2013EP70594 | 02.10.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2904384 | Global Dossier | 16.11.2016 | B1 | EP2904384 | 12.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1259339 | 02.10.2012 | WO2013EP70594 | 02.10.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014053575 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1259339 | 02.10.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2996219 | 03.10.2014 | B1 | FR2996219 | 04.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1259339 | 02.10.2012 |