EP2920653 - RESONATOR THAT IS LESS SENSITIVE TO CLIMATIC VARIATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.09.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nivarox-FAR S.A. Avenue du Collège 10 CH-2400 Le Locle / CH | [2015/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUSIN, Pierre ch. de Poéty CH-1423 Villars-Burquin / CH | 02 /
HESSLER, Thierry Rue de l'Hôpital 3a CH-2024 St-Aubin / CH | 03 /
SALIHU, Fatmir Jolimont 8 CH-2000 Neuchâtel / CH | 04 /
BROCHER, Lucie Av. Tourbillon 76B CH-1950 Sion / CH | 05 /
TRAN, Hung Quoc Ch. Bartolomé 13C CH-2504 Bienne / CH | [2015/39] | Representative(s) | Collé, Emmanuel, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2015/39] | Couillard, Yann Luc Raymond ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 13774213.6 | 10.10.2013 | [2015/39] | WO2013EP71214 | Priority number, date | EP20120193057 | 16.11.2012 Original published format: EP 12193057 | [2015/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014075859 | Date: | 22.05.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2920653 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G04B17/22, B23K26/06, F16F1/10, H03H9/02 | [2015/39] | CPC: |
G04B17/227 (EP,KR,US);
G04B17/063 (US);
G04B17/066 (US);
G04B17/22 (US);
G04B17/24 (US);
H03H3/0076 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/39] | Title | German: | RESONATOR MIT GERINGERER EMPFINDLICHKEIT GEGENÜBER KLIMATISCHEN SCHWANKUNGEN | [2015/39] | English: | RESONATOR THAT IS LESS SENSITIVE TO CLIMATIC VARIATIONS | [2015/39] | French: | RÉSONATEUR MOINS SENSIBLE AUX VARIATIONS CLIMATIQUES | [2015/39] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/39] | 27.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.09.2020 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.04.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 19.04.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.05.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2007000271 (ETA SA MFT HORLOGERE SUISSE [CH], et al); | [X]EP1837722 (ETA SA MFT HORLOGERE SUISSE [CH]); | [X]CH699780 (RICHEMONT INT SA [CH]); | [A]CN102032302 (XI AN JINHE OPTICAL TECHNOLOGY) |