EP2883178 - FEDERATED PATIENT GUARANTEED UNIQUE IDENTIFICATION (GUID) MATCHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/25] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROSS, Brian David c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
CHBAT, Nicolas Wadih c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2015/25] | Representative(s) | Müller, Frank Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/25] | Müller, Frank Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 13774509.7 | 24.07.2013 | WO2013IB56055 | Priority number, date | US201261678373P | 01.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261678373 P | [2015/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014020490 | Date: | 06.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2883178 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2015/25] | CPC: |
G16H10/60 (EP,US);
G06F16/245 (EP,US);
G06F21/606 (US);
G06F21/6245 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/25] | Title | German: | ABGLEICH EINER GARANTIERTEN EINDEUTIGEN PATIENTENIDENTIFIKATION | [2015/25] | English: | FEDERATED PATIENT GUARANTEED UNIQUE IDENTIFICATION (GUID) MATCHING | [2015/25] | French: | MISE EN CORRESPONDANCE D'IDENTIFICATION UNIQUE GARANTIE (GUID) DE PATIENT FÉDÉRÉ | [2015/25] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/25] | 13.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 18.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.04.2019 | Request for further processing for: | 18.12.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 18.12.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.01.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | Examination | US2009177769 | US2004034550 | US2012185267 |