|
30.10.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2019 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.11.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.08.2019 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.07.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2019 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.2019 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
11.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.06.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.06.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.06.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.06.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.06.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.2019 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2019 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.09.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.09.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.2015 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.03.2015 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.12.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
25.11.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
25.11.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.11.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
01.04.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
13.03.2014 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
33 |