Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9667113 | Global Dossier | 30.05.2017 | B2 | US2015155753 | 04.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2012196513 | 06.09.2012 | WO2013IB01821 | 23.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104471837B | Global Dossier | 10.05.2017 | B | CN104471837 | 25.03.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2012196513 | 06.09.2012 | WO2013IB01821 | 23.08.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2845295 | Global Dossier | 25.12.2019 | B1 | EP2845295 | 11.03.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2012196513 | 06.09.2012 | WO2013IB01821 | 23.08.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014037776 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2015 | A3 | WO2014037776 | 13.03.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2012196513 | 06.09.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5742804B | Global Dossier | 01.07.2015 | B2 | JP2014054067 | 20.03.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2012196513 | 06.09.2012 |