30.08.2019 |
Refusal of application |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
05.06.2019 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
15.05.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
10.05.2019 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
15.04.2019 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
09.04.2019 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
09.04.2019 |
Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
09.04.2019 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
26.03.2019 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
04.03.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.02.2019 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.12.2018 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.10.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.04.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.08.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.04.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.04.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.04.2017 |
First examination report |
|
15.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.02.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.07.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
03.07.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
03.07.2015 |
Change - date of supplementary search report |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
12.06.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] |
05.06.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
15.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.01.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
16.01.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
16.10.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.10.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.09.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.09.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.09.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.09.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.11.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.10.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|