EP2837138 - QUALITY OF EXPERIENCE REPORTING FOR COMBINED UNICAST-MULTICAST/BROADCAST STREAMING OF MEDIA CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2015/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OYMAN, Ozgur 425 Navaro Way, Unit 117 San Jose, California 95134 / US | [2015/08] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/08] | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13775131.9 | 09.04.2013 | WO2013US35832 | Priority number, date | US201261621939P | 09.04.2012 Original published format: US 201261621939 P | US201261679627P | 03.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261679627 P | US201213628340 | 27.09.2012 Original published format: US201213628340 | [2015/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013155104 | Date: | 17.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2837138 | Date: | 18.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/02, H04N21/442, H04L12/26, H04L29/06, H04N21/643 | [2015/32] | CPC: |
H04N13/194 (EP,US);
H04L51/58 (CN,RU,SE,US);
H04N13/172 (KR,SE);
H04N21/25825 (EP,CN,SE,US);
H04N21/438 (ES);
H04L12/1863 (EP);
H04L5/0051 (EP);
H04L65/00 (SE);
H04L65/1016 (EP,CN,US);
H04L65/1069 (EP,CN,US);
H04L65/60 (US);
H04L65/611 (EP);
H04L65/612 (EP,CN,US);
H04L65/613 (EP,US);
H04L65/65 (EP,CN,SE,US);
H04L65/70 (EP,CN,SE,US);
H04L65/756 (EP);
H04L65/762 (EP,CN,US);
H04L65/80 (EP,CN,FI,US);
H04N13/00 (US);
H04N21/23 (KR);
H04N21/234309 (US);
H04N21/2353 (US);
H04N21/238 (ES);
H04N21/2404 (US);
H04N21/25833 (EP,CN,SE,US);
H04N21/26258 (EP,CN,SE,US);
H04N21/43 (KR);
H04N21/44209 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/4424 (EP,CN,RU,SE,US);
H04N21/6125 (EP,CN,SE,US);
H04N21/6131 (US);
H04N21/643 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/6437 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/647 (FI);
H04N21/816 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/8456 (EP,CN,SE,US);
H04W4/06 (EP,ES,RU,US);
H04W4/14 (EP,CN,SE,US);
H04W4/50 (EP);
H04W40/248 (CN);
H04W48/18 (CN,SE);
H04W60/00 (ES,SE);
H04W60/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W64/00 (ES);
H04W76/16 (US);
H04W8/06 (CN);
H04W8/08 (KR);
H04W80/12 (ES);
H04W88/02 (KR);
H04L12/189 (EP);
H04N19/105 (US);
H04N19/147 (US);
H04N19/196 (US);
H04N19/44 (EP);
H04N19/46 (US);
H04N19/463 (US);
H04N19/597 (US);
H04N19/70 (EP,US);
H04N19/80 (US);
H04W76/10 (SE);
H04W76/12 (EP);
H04W76/40 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2015/08] | H04L12/26, H04L12/901 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/08] | Title | German: | MELDUNG DER ERFAHRUNGSQUALITÄT FÜR KOMBINIERTES UNICAST-MULTICAST/BROADCAST-STREAMING VON MEDIENINHALTEN | [2015/08] | English: | QUALITY OF EXPERIENCE REPORTING FOR COMBINED UNICAST-MULTICAST/BROADCAST STREAMING OF MEDIA CONTENT | [2015/08] | French: | RAPPORT DE QUALITÉ D'EXPÉRIENCE POUR UNE DIFFUSION EN CONTINU PAR DIFFUSION INDIVIDUELLE-DIFFUSION GROUPÉE/DIFFUSION GÉNÉRALE D'UN CONTENU MULTIMÉDIA | [2015/08] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 19.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/08] | 01.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.12.2019 | 16.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/40] | 26.05.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/40] | 03.12.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.04.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2009316615 (VEDANTHAM RAMAKRISHNA [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0041]; figure 4a *; | [Y] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Transparent end-to-end Packet-switched Streaming Service (PSS); Progressive Download and Dynamic Adaptive Streaming over HTTP (3GP-DASH) (Release 10)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 26.247, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110617), vol. SA WG4, no. V10.0.0, pages 1 - 94, XP050553206 [Y] 1-15 * Chapter 10 * | [A] - OZGUR OYMAN ET AL, "Quality of experience for HTTP adaptive streaming services", vol. 50, no. 4, doi:10.1109/MCOM.2012.6178830, ISSN 0163-6804, (20120405), pages 20 - 27, IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, URL: http://ieeexplore.ieee.org/xpls/abs_all.jsp?arnumber=6178830, XP011440704 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCOM.2012.6178830 | [AP] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Transparent end-to-end Packet-switched Streaming Service (PSS); Progressive Download and Dynamic Adaptive Streaming over HTTP (3GP-DASH) (Release 11)", (20141213), 3GPP DRAFT; 26247-B80, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_sa/WG4_CODEC/Specs_update_after_SA66/, (20141213), XP050924563 [AP] 1-15 | [A] - "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); LTE; IP Multimedia Subsystem (IMS) based Packet Switch Streaming (PSS) and Multimedia Broadcast/Multicast Service (MBMS) User Service; Protocols (3GPP TS 26.237 version 10.4.0 Release 10)", TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS ; FRANCE, (20120101), vol. 3GPP SA 4, no. V10.4.0, XP014069417 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2005089043 (SECKIN GAMZE [US], et al); | [A]US2007237098 (WANG YE-KUI [FI]); | [A]US2009316615 (VEDANTHAM RAMAKRISHNA [US], et al); | [A] - "UMTS; LTE; TRANSPARENT END-TO-END PACKET-SWITCHED STREAMING SERVICE (PSS); PROGRESSIVE DOWNLOAD AND DYNAMIC ADAPTIVE STREAMING OVER HTTP (3GP-DASH) (RELEASE 10)", 3GPP TS 26.247 V10.0.0, (201106), XP050553206 | [A] - RICY K. P. MOK ET AL., "QDASH: A QoE-Aware DASH System.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 3RD MULTIMEDIA SYSTEMS CONFERENCE (MMSYS'12)., (20120222), XP055065409 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2155555.2155558 | by applicant | US2009316615 | - "Quality of experience for HTTP adaptive streaming services", OZGUR OYMAN ET AL., IEEE Communications magazine, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, (20120405), vol. 50, pages 20 - 27 |