EP2838255 - SOLID-STATE IMAGE PICKUP DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
Former [2015/44] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2015/08] | For all designated states Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSHIKUBO, Hiromichi OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 02 /
ADACHI, Satoru OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/45] |
Former [2015/08] | 01 /
OSHIKUBO, Hiromichi c/o OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
02 /
ADACHI, Satoru c/o OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/08] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13775995.7 | 02.04.2013 | WO2013JP60088 | Priority number, date | JP20120088369 | 09.04.2012 Original published format: JP 2012088369 | [2015/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013153991 | Date: | 17.10.2013 | Language: | JA | [2013/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2838255 | Date: | 18.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/3745, H01L27/146 | [2017/45] | CPC: |
H04N25/46 (EP,US);
H01L27/14643 (US);
H01L27/14636 (US);
H04N25/60 (EP,US);
H04N25/616 (EP,US);
H04N25/677 (EP,US);
H04N25/78 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/50] | H04N5/363, H04N5/374, H04N5/3745 | ||
Former IPC [2015/08] | H04N5/363, H04N5/374 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/08] | Title | German: | FESTKÖRPERBILDAUFNAHMEVORRICHTUNG | [2015/08] | English: | SOLID-STATE IMAGE PICKUP DEVICE | [2015/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRISE DE VUE À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2015/08] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2014 | Translation filed | 21.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2014 | Search fee paid | 21.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/08] | 28.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/35] | 10.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.10.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005206752 (LIM SUHUN [KR]); | [A]US2011025900 (KONDO HIROYASU [JP]) | International search | [A]JP2000078474 (CANON KK); | [A]JP2002320235 (FUJITSU LTD); | [A]JP2006014107 (OLYMPUS CORP); | [A]JP2006020037 (SONY CORP); | [A]JP2008092014 (OLYMPUS CORP); | [A]JP2009296121 (OLYMPUS CORP); | [A]JP2010157803 (OLYMPUS CORP) | by applicant | JP2000004399 |