EP2804756 - HIGH DENSITY UNIDIRECTIONAL FABRIC FOR SOFT BALLISTICS APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Barrday, Inc. 75 Moorefield Street Cambridge, Ontario N1R 5W6 / CA | For all designated states Teijin Aramid B.V. Velperweg 76 P.O. Box 5153 6802 ED Arnhem / NL | [2014/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN HEERDEN, Jason 54 Harris Street Cambridge, Ontario N1R 8M9 / CA | 02 /
MACNEIL, Jonathan 5126 East Liberty Hill Road York, South Carolina 29745 / US | 03 /
PATEL, Chinkal 51 Camp Drive Ancaster, Ontario L9K 0A5 / CA | 04 /
TOWERY, Matt 1323F Corton Drive Charlotte, North Carolina 28203 / US | 05 /
WILSON, Jason 8926 Glade Court Huntersville, North Carolina 28078 / US | 06 /
DE HAAS, Marc-Jan Kinkelenburg 1 NL-7339 DJ Apeldoorn / NL | [2014/48] | Representative(s) | CPW GmbH Kasinostraße 19-21 42103 Wuppertal / DE | [2014/48] | Application number, filing date | 13776344.7 | 17.01.2013 | WO2013US21905 | Priority number, date | US201261587310P | 17.01.2012 Original published format: US 201261587310 P | [2014/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013154643 | Date: | 17.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2804756 | Date: | 26.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/00, B32B5/22, B32B5/24, B32B5/26 | [2015/28] | CPC: |
B32B5/12 (EP,KR,US);
B32B5/26 (KR);
F41H5/0478 (KR,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/12 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/20 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/302 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,KR,US);
D02J1/18 (EP,KR,US);
F41H1/02 (KR);
F41H5/0485 (KR,US);
B32B2250/02 (KR,US);
B32B2250/20 (KR,US);
B32B2250/24 (KR,US);
B32B2260/021 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2260/046 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2262/0269 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/54 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/581 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/718 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2323/00 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2571/02 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/48] | B32B27/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/48] | Title | German: | HOCHDICHTES UNIDIREKTIONALES GEWEBE FÜR WEICHE BALLISTIKANWENDUNGEN | [2014/48] | English: | HIGH DENSITY UNIDIRECTIONAL FABRIC FOR SOFT BALLISTICS APPLICATIONS | [2014/48] | French: | TISSU UNIDIRECTIONNEL À HAUTE DENSITÉ POUR APPLICATIONS DE BALISTIQUE SOUPLE | [2014/48] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2014 | Search fee paid | 18.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/48] | 22.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/01] | 29.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO03053676 (DU PONT [US]) [Y] 1-15 * claim 6 * * page 17, lines 10-15 ** the whole document *; | [Y]EP1951510 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * example 2 * * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraphs [0023] , [0032] * * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2008064280 (BHATNAGAR ASHOK [US], et al); | [Y]US2008268733 (PRITCHARD LAURA [US], et al); | [Y]US2010122517 (SIMMELINK JOSEPH ARNOLD PAUL MARIA [NL], et al); | [A]US2010239810 (BHATNAGAR ASHOK [US], et al) |