EP2909626 - MEANS AND METHODS FOR DETERMINING A CLEARANCE NORMALIZED AMOUNT OF A METABOLITE DISEASE BIOMARKER IN A SAMPLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states metanomics GmbH Tegeler Weg 33 10589 Berlin / DE | For all designated states Ruprecht-Karls-Universität Heidelberg Grabengasse 1 69117 Heidelberg / DE | [2015/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUHRMANN, Jens Strelitzer Str. 56 10115 Berlin / DE | 02 /
FISCHER, Jenny Thrasoltstr. 1 10585 Berlin / DE | 03 /
RESZKA, Regina Goethestr. 23 16341 Panketal / DE | 04 /
KATUS, Hugo A. Philosophenweg 17 69120 Heidelberg / DE | 05 /
FREY, Norbert Volbehrstraße 25a 24119 Kronshagen / DE | 06 /
SIGL, Johanna Dorfgärtenstrasse 22 68199 Mannheim / DE | 07 /
WEIS, Tanja Langenzell 3 69257 Wiesenbach / DE | [2015/35] | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 2 68165 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/27] | Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Dudenstrasse 46 68167 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2015/35] | Dick, Alexander Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Dudenstraße 46 68167 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 13776836.2 | 16.10.2013 | [2015/35] | WO2013EP71648 | Priority number, date | EP20120189027 | 18.10.2012 Original published format: EP 12189027 | US201261715338P | 18.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261715338 P | [2015/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014060486 | Date: | 24.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2909626 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2909626 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/50 | [2015/35] | CPC: |
G01N33/6896 (EP,US);
G01N33/92 (US);
G01N33/50 (EP,US);
G01N33/62 (US);
G01N33/64 (US);
G01N2405/04 (US);
G01N2405/08 (US);
G01N2560/00 (US);
G01N2800/02 (EP,US);
G01N2800/042 (EP,US);
G01N2800/2814 (EP,US);
G01N2800/32 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MITTEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER CLEARANCE-NORMALISIERTEN MENGE EINES STOFFWECHSELKRANKHEITBIOMARKERS IN EINER PROBE | [2018/08] | English: | MEANS AND METHODS FOR DETERMINING A CLEARANCE NORMALIZED AMOUNT OF A METABOLITE DISEASE BIOMARKER IN A SAMPLE | [2015/35] | French: | SUPPORTS ET PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER UNE QUANTITÉ NORMALISÉE DE DÉGAGEMENT D'UN BIOMARQUEUR DE LA MALADIE DE MÉTABOLITE DANS UN ÉCHANTILLON | [2018/08] |
Former [2015/35] | MITTEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER CLEARANCE-NORMALISIERTEN MENGE EINES STOFFWECHSELKRANKHEITSBIOMARKERS IN EINER PROBE | ||
Former [2015/35] | MOYENS ET PROCÉDÉS DE DÉTERMINATION D'UNE QUANTITÉ NORMALISÉE PAR LA CLAIRANCE D'UN BIOMARQUEUR DE MALADIE DE MÉTABOLITE DANS UN ÉCHANTILLON | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/35] | 21.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.10.2013 | AL | 04.07.2018 | AT | 04.07.2018 | CY | 04.07.2018 | CZ | 04.07.2018 | DK | 04.07.2018 | EE | 04.07.2018 | FI | 04.07.2018 | HR | 04.07.2018 | LT | 04.07.2018 | LV | 04.07.2018 | MC | 04.07.2018 | MK | 04.07.2018 | NL | 04.07.2018 | PL | 04.07.2018 | PT | 04.07.2018 | RO | 04.07.2018 | RS | 04.07.2018 | SE | 04.07.2018 | SI | 04.07.2018 | SK | 04.07.2018 | SM | 04.07.2018 | TR | 04.07.2018 | BG | 04.10.2018 | NO | 04.10.2018 | GR | 05.10.2018 | IE | 16.10.2018 | LU | 16.10.2018 | MT | 16.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | IS | 04.11.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PT | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IE | 16.10.2018 | ||
LU | 16.10.2018 | ||
MT | 16.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IE | 16.10.2018 | ||
LU | 16.10.2018 | ||
MT | 16.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IE | 16.10.2018 | ||
LU | 16.10.2018 | ||
MT | 16.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IE | 16.10.2018 | ||
LU | 16.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
LU | 16.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
LU | 16.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
LU | 16.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
LU | 16.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 04.07.2018 | |
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 04.07.2018 | |
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 04.07.2018 | Cited in | International search | [YA]WO0101150 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [Y] 3 * page 42, line 9 - line 13 * [A] 1,2,4-14; | [XYI] - BADGWELL ET AL, "Urinary mesothelin provides greater sensitivity for early stage ovarian cancer than serum mesothelin, urinary hCG free beta subunit and urinary hCG beta core fragment", GYNECOLOGIC ONCOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, LONDON, GB, (20070827), vol. 106, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.YGYNO.2007.04.022, ISSN 0090-8258, pages 490 - 497, XP022215093 [X] 1,5-7,10 * page 493, column r, paragraph l - page 494, column l, paragraph 2; figure 2C; table 2 * [Y] 2,3,11 [I] 4,9,12-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ygyno.2007.04.022 | [Y] - JERNBERG TOMAS ET AL, "Cystatin C - A novel predictor of outcome in suspected or confirmed non-ST-elevation acute coronary syndrome", CIRCULATION, (20041019), vol. 110, no. 16, ISSN 0009-7322, pages 2342 - 2348, XP002696858 [Y] 2,11 * page 2346, column l, paragraph l - column r, paragraph 1; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/01.CIR.0000145166.44942.E0 | by applicant | US4540884 | US5397894 | WO03073464 | WO2007110357 | WO2007110358 | WO2011092285 | WO2012085890 | - GRUBB, ACTA MED SCAND, (1985), vol. 218, no. 5, pages 499 - 503 | - SIMONSEN, SCAND J CLIN INVEST, (1985), vol. 45, no. 2, pages 97 - 101 | - JANOWSKI, NAT STRUCT BIOL, (2001), vol. 8, no. 4, pages 316 - 320 | - NISSEN, JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY A, (1995), vol. 703, pages 37 - 57 |