EP2892781 - RAILWAY TRACTION VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rentaloc, besloten vennootschap met beperkte aansprakelijkheid Industriestraat 6 2500 Lier / BE | [2017/13] |
Former [2015/29] | For all designated states Rentaloc, besloten vennootschap met beperkte aansprakelijkheid Zandhovensebaan 76 2970 Schilde / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KROLS, Dirk Oude Booischotsebaan 98 B2820 Bonheiden / BE | 02 /
RAYMAEKERS, Bart Zandhovensebaan 76 B-2970 Schilde / BE | [2015/29] | Representative(s) | Donné, Eddy Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv. Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | [2016/41] |
Former [2015/29] | Donné, Eddy Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | Application number, filing date | 13777219.0 | 28.08.2013 | [2016/41] | WO2013BE00044 | Priority number, date | BE20120000572 | 03.09.2012 Original published format: BE 201200572 | [2015/29] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014032126 | Date: | 06.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2892781 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2892781 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B61D15/00, B61J3/12, B60F1/04 | [2015/29] | CPC: |
B60F1/043 (EP,US);
B61D15/00 (EP,US);
B61J3/12 (EP,US);
B60F2301/04 (EP,US);
Y02T30/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHIENENTRIEBFAHRZEUG | [2015/29] | English: | RAILWAY TRACTION VEHICLE | [2015/29] | French: | VEHICULE A TRACTION FERROVIAIRE | [2016/17] |
Former [2015/29] | VÉHICULE TRACTEUR FERROVIAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/29] | 06.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.08.2013 | AL | 12.10.2016 | CY | 12.10.2016 | EE | 12.10.2016 | HR | 12.10.2016 | LT | 12.10.2016 | LV | 12.10.2016 | MK | 12.10.2016 | RS | 12.10.2016 | SI | 12.10.2016 | SK | 12.10.2016 | BG | 12.01.2017 | GR | 13.01.2017 | IS | 12.02.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 28.08.2013 | |
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MK | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 28.08.2013 | |
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 28.08.2013 | |
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | EE | 12.10.2016 | |
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/43] | EE | 12.10.2016 | |
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | HR | 12.10.2016 | |
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 12.10.2016 | Cited in | International search | [IY]US4355584 (WHITE JR EUGENE B) [I] 1,18,21 * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 61 * * column 5, line 38 - line 57; figures 1-3 * [Y] 4,5; | [IY]US6021719 (KERSHAW JR ROYCE G [US]) [I] 1,10 * column 2, line 66 - column 4, line 15 * * column 4, line 35 - line 42; figures 6,10 * [Y] 4,5; | [A]US2005204949 (JACOB CHARLES [US]) [A] 14* figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [Y]DE102005002407 (BOESE MANFRED [DE]) [Y] 4,5 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018]; figures 1-3 * |