EP2818011 - USING PEER DEVICES TO LOCATE A MOBILE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2017/45] |
Former [2016/52] | For all designated states Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | ||
Former [2015/01] | For all designated states Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZELINKA, Stephen, D. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2015/01] | Representative(s) | Watkin, Timothy Lawrence Harvey, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0QL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/52] | Fraser, Karen Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2015/01] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 13778519.2 | 09.04.2013 | [2016/52] | WO2013US35710 | Priority number, date | US201213450029 | 18.04.2012 Original published format: US201213450029 | [2015/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013158401 | Date: | 24.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2818011 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2818011 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W64/00, G01S5/02, H04W4/02, H04W4/06, H04W4/20 | [2015/10] | CPC: |
H04W4/023 (EP,US);
G01S5/0284 (EP,US);
H04W4/02 (EP);
H04W4/06 (EP,US);
H04W4/20 (EP);
G01S5/0289 (EP,US);
H04W64/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/01] | H04W64/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON PEER-VORRICHTUNGEN ZUM LOKALISIEREN EINER MOBILVORRICHTUNG | [2015/01] | English: | USING PEER DEVICES TO LOCATE A MOBILE DEVICE | [2015/01] | French: | UTILISATION DE DISPOSITIFS HOMOLOGUES POUR LOCALISER UN DISPOSITIF MOBILE | [2015/01] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 24.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/01] | 27.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16199661.6 / EP3151619 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.04.2013 | AL | 28.12.2016 | AT | 28.12.2016 | BE | 28.12.2016 | CY | 28.12.2016 | CZ | 28.12.2016 | DK | 28.12.2016 | EE | 28.12.2016 | ES | 28.12.2016 | FI | 28.12.2016 | HR | 28.12.2016 | IT | 28.12.2016 | LT | 28.12.2016 | LV | 28.12.2016 | MC | 28.12.2016 | MK | 28.12.2016 | NL | 28.12.2016 | PL | 28.12.2016 | RO | 28.12.2016 | RS | 28.12.2016 | SE | 28.12.2016 | SI | 28.12.2016 | SK | 28.12.2016 | SM | 28.12.2016 | TR | 28.12.2016 | BG | 28.03.2017 | NO | 28.03.2017 | GR | 29.03.2017 | IE | 09.04.2017 | LU | 09.04.2017 | MT | 09.04.2017 | IS | 28.04.2017 | PT | 28.04.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 09.04.2013 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
MK | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
TR | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 09.04.2017 | ||
LU | 09.04.2017 | ||
MT | 09.04.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 09.04.2013 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
MK | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 09.04.2017 | ||
LU | 09.04.2017 | ||
MT | 09.04.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 09.04.2013 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 09.04.2017 | ||
LU | 09.04.2017 | ||
MT | 09.04.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 09.04.2013 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 09.04.2017 | ||
LU | 09.04.2017 | ||
MT | 09.04.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IE | 09.04.2017 | ||
LU | 09.04.2017 | ||
MT | 09.04.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LU | 09.04.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | BE | 28.12.2016 | |
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 28.12.2016 | |
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 28.12.2016 | |
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 28.12.2016 | |
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
RS | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 28.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2004214584 (MARINIER PAUL [CA]) [I] 1-8 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0026] * * figures 1,2 *; | [XYI]US2010260150 (ARYAN BABAK [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,7,8 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0088] * * figures 2-4,6,8 * [Y] 9-15 [I] 2,4,6; | [Y]US2011159862 (JACKSON BRUCE K [GB]) [Y] 9-15 * sections I,II *; | [A] - ZHICHAO ZHU ET AL, "APPLAUS: A Privacy-Preserving Location Proof Updating System for location-based services", INFOCOM, 2011 PROCEEDINGS IEEE, IEEE, (20110410), doi:10.1109/INFCOM.2011.5934991, ISBN 978-1-4244-9919-9, pages 1889 - 1897, XP031953380 [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0084] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/INFCOM.2011.5934991 | International search | [A]WO0127649 (MOTOROLA INC [US]); | [A]WO0158098 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [A]US2008188242 (CARLSON JOHN [US], et al); | [A]US2010014443 (CRISTIAN VOICU [US], et al); | [A]US2010246405 (POTKONJAK MIODRAG [US]) | by applicant | US2004214584 | US2010260150 |