EP2903871 - AN ADAPTIVE BRAKING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bentley Motors Limited Pym's Lane Crewe, Cheshire CW1 3PL / GB | [2015/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O MEACHAIR, Deaglan 6 Delamere Road Nantwich Cheshire CW5 7DR / GB | 02 /
CRUMPTON, Matthew 7 Basset Close Willaston Nantwich Cheshire CW5 6RJ / GB | [2015/33] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [2015/33] | Application number, filing date | 13779331.1 | 02.10.2013 | [2015/33] | WO2013GB52560 | Priority number, date | GB20120017591 | 02.10.2012 Original published format: GB 201217591 | [2015/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014053827 | Date: | 10.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2903871 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2903871 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/172, B60T8/26 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
B60T8/172 (EP,CN,US);
B60T8/18 (GB);
B60T13/66 (US);
B60T13/02 (GB);
B60T13/10 (GB);
B60T13/74 (GB);
B60T8/171 (US);
B60T8/175 (US);
B60T8/176 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ADAPTIVES BREMSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2015/33] | English: | AN ADAPTIVE BRAKING SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2015/33] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE FREINAGE ADAPTATIF | [2015/33] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/33] | 12.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.10.2013 | AL | 12.10.2016 | AT | 12.10.2016 | BE | 12.10.2016 | CY | 12.10.2016 | CZ | 12.10.2016 | DK | 12.10.2016 | EE | 12.10.2016 | ES | 12.10.2016 | FI | 12.10.2016 | HR | 12.10.2016 | IT | 12.10.2016 | LT | 12.10.2016 | LV | 12.10.2016 | MC | 12.10.2016 | MK | 12.10.2016 | NL | 12.10.2016 | PL | 12.10.2016 | RO | 12.10.2016 | RS | 12.10.2016 | SE | 12.10.2016 | SI | 12.10.2016 | SK | 12.10.2016 | SM | 12.10.2016 | TR | 12.10.2016 | BG | 12.01.2017 | NO | 12.01.2017 | GR | 13.01.2017 | IS | 12.02.2017 | PT | 13.02.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 02.10.2013 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
MK | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
TR | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 02.10.2013 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
MK | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 02.10.2013 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 02.10.2013 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RS | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 12.10.2016 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE19911902 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [Y] 4,31,32 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1081006 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 9,10,12,28,29,33,35,36 * figure 4 *; | [XI]DE19942290 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,8,11,15-22,25-27,35 * column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 26 * * figures 1,2 * [I] 6,7,23,24; | [X]US2002005662 (YASUI YOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,6-10,14-19,21,23-27,33-36 * figures 3A, 3B, 4-10 *; | [XY]DE102009053824 (LUCAS AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,8,11,16,18-21,30 * paragraph [0013] * * claim 1 * [Y] 4,9,10,12,13,28,29,31-33,35,36; | [Y]DE102010002574 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 13* claims 1,6 * |