|
16.03.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.03.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2019 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.03.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.12.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.12.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
17.12.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
04.04.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.11.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.09.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.09.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2015 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2015 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2015 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.2015 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
17.12.2014 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.06.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.06.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.06.2014 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2014 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.04.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
25.04.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.04.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
03.03.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
13.02.2014 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
21.10.2013 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.10.2013 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
21.10.2013 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
28 |
|
21.10.2013 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
9 |