|
07.11.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2018 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2017 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
22.11.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
22.11.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.09.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.09.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.09.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
15.09.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
03.04.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
03.04.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
03.04.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
03.04.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
03.04.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.01.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2017 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2016 |
Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.2015 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2015 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.05.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2015 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.04.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
10.04.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
10.04.2015 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.02.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.12.2014 |
Republication of front page of international application with corrected bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.2014 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
59 |
|
13.05.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
51 |
|
24.04.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2014 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
14.01.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
14.01.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
14.01.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
26.11.2013 |
Notification relating to declaration under Rule 4.17 PCT (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.10.2013 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.10.2013 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
10 |
|
21.10.2013 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
36 |
|
21.10.2013 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
2 |