Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9346743 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2016 | B2 | US2016102046 | 14.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201314237600 | 09.10.2013 | US201361863193 | 07.08.2013 | WO2013US63995 | 09.10.2013 | US201261713688 | 15.10.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101991148B | Global Dossier | 19.06.2019 | B1 | KR20150067326 | 17.06.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361863193 | 07.08.2013 | WO2013US63995 | 09.10.2013 | US201261713688 | 15.10.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6289479B | Global Dossier | 07.03.2018 | B2 | JP2015531408 | 02.11.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361863193 | 07.08.2013 | WO2013US63995 | 09.10.2013 | US201261713688 | 15.10.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL238003 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361863193 | 07.08.2013 | WO2013US63995 | 09.10.2013 | US201261713688 | 15.10.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104918912B | Global Dossier | 22.02.2017 | B | CN104918912 | 16.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361863193 | 07.08.2013 | WO2013US63995 | 09.10.2013 | US201261713688 | 15.10.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2886973 | Global Dossier | 15.08.2017 | C | CA2886973 | 24.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361863193 | 07.08.2013 | WO2013US63995 | 09.10.2013 | US201261713688 | 15.10.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2013331731B | Global Dossier | 17.08.2017 | B9 | AU2013331731 | 20.04.2017 | A9 | AU2013331731B | 13.04.2017 | B2 | AU2013331731 | 14.05.2015 | A2 | AU2013331731 | 07.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361863193 | 07.08.2013 | WO2013US63995 | 09.10.2013 | US201261713688 | 15.10.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2906530 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2018 | B1 | EP2906530 | 19.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361863193 | 07.08.2013 | WO2013US63995 | 09.10.2013 | US201261713688 | 15.10.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015008171 | 19.01.2021 | B1 | BR112015008171 | 04.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201361863193 | 07.08.2013 | WO2013US63995 | 09.10.2013 | US201261713688 | 15.10.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2664050T | 18.04.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201361863193 | 07.08.2013 | WO2013US63995 | 09.10.2013 | US201261713688 | 15.10.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN2588DELNP2015 | 11.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361863193 | 07.08.2013 | WO2013US63995 | 09.10.2013 | US201261713688 | 15.10.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX348338 | 07.06.2017 | B | MX2015004325 | 29.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361863193 | 07.08.2013 | WO2013US63995 | 09.10.2013 | US201261713688 | 15.10.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ707115 | 23.03.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361863193 | 07.08.2013 | WO2013US63995 | 09.10.2013 | US201261713688 | 15.10.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2650110 | 09.04.2018 | C2 | RU2015118164 | 10.12.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361863193 | 07.08.2013 | WO2013US63995 | 09.10.2013 | US201261713688 | 15.10.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SA515360281 | 02.08.2015 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201361863193 | 07.08.2013 | WO2013US63995 | 09.10.2013 | US201261713688 | 15.10.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014062428 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2014 | A8 | WO2014062428 | 24.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361863193 | 07.08.2013 | US201261713688 | 15.10.2012 |