EP2909162 - METHOD OF MAKING ALPHA, OMEGA-DIIODOPERFLUOROALKANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/38] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2015/35] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIN, Steven J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
DRESSEL, Luke T. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
HUTT, Aaron E. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
SCHOTZ, Eric A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 05 /
SPAWN, Terence D. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 06 /
GUERRA, Miguel A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 07 /
FUKUSHI, Tatsuo 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 08 /
MILLER, Jeremy A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 09 /
GEISE, Christopher M. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 10 /
MCDONELL, James A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2015/35] | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/35] | Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13779707.2 | 09.10.2013 | [2015/35] | WO2013US64109 | Priority number, date | US201261715059P | 17.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261715059 P | [2015/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014062450 | Date: | 24.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2909162 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2909162 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07C17/26, C07C19/16, C07C17/00 | [2015/35] | CPC: |
C07C17/00 (EP,RU,US);
C07C45/58 (US);
C07C17/093 (EP,RU,US);
C07C17/26 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/093, C07C19/16 (US,EP);
C07C17/26, C07C19/16 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ALPHA,OMEGA-DIIODPERFLUORALKANEN | [2015/35] | English: | METHOD OF MAKING ALPHA, OMEGA-DIIODOPERFLUOROALKANES | [2015/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'ALPHA,OMÉGA-DIIODOPERFLUOROALCANES | [2015/35] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/35] | 09.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.10.2013 | AL | 21.09.2016 | AT | 21.09.2016 | BE | 21.09.2016 | CY | 21.09.2016 | CZ | 21.09.2016 | DK | 21.09.2016 | EE | 21.09.2016 | ES | 21.09.2016 | FI | 21.09.2016 | HR | 21.09.2016 | LT | 21.09.2016 | LV | 21.09.2016 | MC | 21.09.2016 | MK | 21.09.2016 | NL | 21.09.2016 | RO | 21.09.2016 | RS | 21.09.2016 | SE | 21.09.2016 | SI | 21.09.2016 | SK | 21.09.2016 | SM | 21.09.2016 | TR | 21.09.2016 | IE | 09.10.2016 | LU | 09.10.2016 | CH | 31.10.2016 | LI | 31.10.2016 | MT | 31.10.2016 | FR | 21.11.2016 | BG | 21.12.2016 | NO | 21.12.2016 | GR | 22.12.2016 | IS | 21.01.2017 | PT | 23.01.2017 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 09.10.2013 | |
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
HR | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
MK | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
TR | 21.09.2016 | ||
IE | 09.10.2016 | ||
LU | 09.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 21.11.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | HU | 09.10.2013 | |
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
HR | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
MK | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
IE | 09.10.2016 | ||
LU | 09.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 21.11.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 09.10.2013 | |
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
HR | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
MK | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
IE | 09.10.2016 | ||
LU | 09.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 21.11.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 09.10.2013 | |
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
HR | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
MK | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
IE | 09.10.2016 | ||
LU | 09.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 21.11.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
IE | 09.10.2016 | ||
LU | 09.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 21.11.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
LU | 09.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 21.11.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 21.11.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
FR | 21.11.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 21.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3475299 (SLAGER JAMES EDWARD) [A] 1-22* column 4, line 32 - line 38 *; | [A]WO9730957 (DU PONT [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * claim 1 * * examples 1-12 * * page 2, line 31 * * page 4, line 13 - line 14 * |