|
13.09.2017 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.2016 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.08.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.08.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2016 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2016 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.08.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.08.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
06.04.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
02.03.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2016 |
Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2016 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.02.2016 |
Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2016 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2015 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.11.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.11.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.11.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2015 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.11.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.11.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
15.07.2015 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2015 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.04.2015 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.2015 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2015 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
56 |
|
27.03.2015 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
27.03.2015 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
27.03.2015 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.03.2015 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.02.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.12.2014 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
10 |
|
08.12.2014 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.12.2014 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
08.12.2014 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
08.12.2014 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.11.2014 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
04.11.2014 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Annex |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
03.11.2014 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
03.11.2014 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
09.09.2014 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.09.2014 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
09.09.2014 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
28.07.2014 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2014 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
21.06.2014 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
21.06.2014 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
21.06.2014 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
21.06.2014 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
21.06.2014 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
21.06.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.06.2014 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
8 |
|
21.06.2014 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
8 |
|
30.04.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
45 |
|
30.04.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.04.2014 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
10.01.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
10.01.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
10.01.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
29.10.2013 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
29.10.2013 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
24.10.2013 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.10.2013 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
30.09.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
6 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
22 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
20 |