EP2903583 - TRANSFER DEVICE FOR TAPPING OR DELIVERING A FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states medac Gesellschaft für klinische Spezialpräparate mbH Theaterstrasse 6 22880 Wedel / DE | [2015/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAINDL, Hans Georgsplatz 1 30974 Wennigsen / DE | 02 /
HENNINGER, Peter Schlierbacher Weg 21 63636 Brachttal / DE | 03 /
HAMM, German 6 Tulbagh Road Milnerton 7441 Cape Town / ZA | [2015/33] | Representative(s) | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert Patentanwalt Friedrich-Ebert-Anlage 11b 63450 Hanau / DE | [2015/33] | Application number, filing date | 13780317.7 | 30.09.2013 | [2015/33] | WO2013EP70320 | Priority number, date | DE201210109322 | 01.10.2012 Original published format: DE102012109322 | DE201210113002 | 21.12.2012 Original published format: DE102012113002 | [2015/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014053430 | Date: | 10.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2903583 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2903583 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61J1/20 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
A61J1/20 (EP,US);
A61J1/2051 (US);
A61J1/1406 (US);
A61J1/201 (EP,US);
A61J1/2055 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSFERVORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTNAHME ODER ÜBERGABE EINES FLUIDS | [2015/33] | English: | TRANSFER DEVICE FOR TAPPING OR DELIVERING A FLUID | [2015/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSFERT POUR PRÉLEVER OU TRANSFÉRER UN FLUIDE | [2015/33] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/33] | 17.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.09.2013 | AL | 09.11.2016 | CY | 09.11.2016 | EE | 09.11.2016 | HR | 09.11.2016 | LT | 09.11.2016 | LV | 09.11.2016 | MC | 09.11.2016 | MK | 09.11.2016 | MT | 09.11.2016 | RO | 09.11.2016 | RS | 09.11.2016 | SI | 09.11.2016 | SM | 09.11.2016 | TR | 09.11.2016 | BG | 09.02.2017 | NO | 09.02.2017 | GR | 10.02.2017 | IS | 09.03.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 30.09.2013 | |
CY | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
MK | 09.11.2016 | ||
MT | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
TR | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 30.09.2013 | |
CY | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
MK | 09.11.2016 | ||
MT | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 30.09.2013 | |
CY | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
MT | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 30.09.2013 | |
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
MT | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | EE | 09.11.2016 | |
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
MT | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | EE | 09.11.2016 | |
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | EE | 09.11.2016 | |
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/43] | EE | 09.11.2016 | |
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
SM | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | EE | 09.11.2016 | |
HR | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | HR | 09.11.2016 | |
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
RS | 09.11.2016 | ||
NO | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 09.11.2016 | Cited in | International search | US4576211 [ ] (VALENTINI LUIGI [IT], et al) [ ] * the whole document *; | [X]EP0311787 (ERBA CARLO SPA [IT]) [X] 1-3,8-10,13 * column 2, line 36 - column 5, line 8; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]WO0047159 (BIODOME [FR], et al) [Y] 16,17* page 7, line 26 - page 9, line 13; figures 3-5 *; | [Y]EP1574200 (P2A MEDICAL [FR]) [Y] 6 * figures 2, 3 *; | [YD]EP1430864 (NIPRO CORP [JP]) [YD] 4,7 * paragraphs [0017] , [0018] , [0021]; figures 5-9 *; | [XY]WO2011140596 (NOBLE HOUSE GROUP PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-3,5,8,13-15 * page 6, line 17 - page 10, line 11 * * page 13, line 14 - page 16, line 10 * * figures 1-8 * [Y] 4,6,7,16,17 | by applicant | DE69808432T | DE102005006771 | EP1430864 |