EP2838264 - METHOD FOR ENCODING MULTIVIEW VIDEO USING REFERENCE LIST FOR MULTIVIEW VIDEO PREDICTION AND DEVICE THEREFOR, AND METHOD FOR DECODING MULTIVIEW VIDEO USING REFERNECE LIST FOR MULTIVIEW VIDEO PREDICTION AND DEVICE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2020 [2020/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2015/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Byeong-doo 203-801 Cheonggu 2-cha Apt. Daeya-dong Siheung-si Gyeonggi-do 429-717 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Jae-hyun 1-401 Gungjoen Apt. Banpo-dong Seocho-gu Seoul 137-040 / KR | 03 /
PARK, Jeong-hoon 110-1506 Dong-a Apt. Bongcheon 2-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-050 / KR | [2015/08] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/08] | Jones, Ithel Rhys Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax, Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 13780642.8 | 23.04.2013 | WO2013KR03459 | Priority number, date | US201261636918P | 23.04.2012 Original published format: US 201261636918 P | [2015/08] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013162251 | Date: | 31.10.2013 | Language: | KO | [2013/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2838264 | Date: | 18.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/597, H04N13/00, H04N19/503, H04N19/30, H04N19/61, H04N19/58 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
H04N19/503 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/597 (EP,KR,US);
H04N13/161 (US);
H04N19/105 (KR);
H04N19/176 (KR);
H04N19/30 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/08] | H04N7/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MEHRFACHANSICHTSVIDEOCODIERUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER REFERENZLISTE ZUR MEHRFACHANSICHTSVIDEOVORHERSAGE UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR SOWIE MEHRFACHANSICHTSVIDEODECODIERUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER REFERENZLISTE ZUR MEHRFACHANSICHTSVIDEOVORHERSAGE UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2015/08] | English: | METHOD FOR ENCODING MULTIVIEW VIDEO USING REFERENCE LIST FOR MULTIVIEW VIDEO PREDICTION AND DEVICE THEREFOR, AND METHOD FOR DECODING MULTIVIEW VIDEO USING REFERNECE LIST FOR MULTIVIEW VIDEO PREDICTION AND DEVICE THEREFOR | [2015/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE DE VIDÉO MULTIVUE AU MOYEN D'UNE LISTE DE RÉFÉRENCE DE PRÉDICTION DE VIDÉO MULTIVUE ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ, ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCODAGE DE VIDÉO MULTIVUE AU MOYEN D'UNE LISTE DE RÉFÉRENCE DE PRÉDICTION DE VIDÉO MULTIVUE ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ | [2015/08] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2014 | Translation filed | 12.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2014 | Search fee paid | 12.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/08] | 04.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/06] | 02.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2008048499 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 2 * * page 8, line 4 - page 11, line 18 *; | [I] - "Joint Multi-view Video Model (JFVM) 1 [06/08/11]", 20. JVT MEETING; 77. MPEG MEETING; 15-07-2006 - 21-07-2006;KLAGENFURT, AT; (JOINT VIDEO TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-TSG.16 ),, (20060817), no. JVT-T208, ISSN 0000-0408, XP030006640 [I] 1-15 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line l * * page 22, paragraph G.7.4.1 * | [A] - LEE T ET AL, "Syntax reordering of Reference List Modification and Combination", 9. JCT-VC MEETING; 100. MPEG MEETING; 27-4-2012 - 7-5-2012; GENEVA; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20120416), no. JCTVC-I0131, XP030111894 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - SJÃBERG R ET AL, "AHG21: Reference picture list restrictions", 8. JCT-VC MEETING; 99. MPEG MEETING; 1-2-2012 - 10-2-2012; SAN JOSE; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20120121), no. JCTVC-H0412, XP030111439 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [XP] - BYEONGDOO CHOI ET AL, "3D-HEVC HLS: On Reference list", 100. MPEG MEETING; 30-4-2012 - 4-5-2012; GENEVA; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20120427), no. m24876, XP030053219 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2008089428 (NAKAMURA HIROYA [JP], et al); | [X]KR20080034752 (UNIV KYUNG HEE UNIV IND COOP GROUP [KR]); | [Y]KR20090099093 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]US2010091844 (JEON BYEONG MOON [KR], et al); | [A]US2010189173 (CHEN YING [US], et al) |