EP2841606 - FUSION PROTEINS TO FACILITATE SELECTION OF CELLS INFECTED WITH SPECIFIC IMMUNOGLOBULIN GENE RECOMBINANT VACCINIA VIRUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vaccinex, Inc. 1895 Mt. Hope Avenue Rochester, NY 14620 / US | [2015/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Ernest S. 328 Boston Road Ontario, NY 14519 / US | 02 /
PANDINA, Tracy 115 Timarron Trail Rochester, NY 14612 / US | 03 /
BALCH, Leslie A. 15 Aldrich Glen Fairport, NY 14450 / US | 04 /
PARIS, Mark 24 Bosworth Field Mendon, NY 14506 / US | 05 /
ZAUDERER, Maurice 44 Woodland Road Pittsford, NY 14534 / US | 06 /
MOKSA, Angelika 14 Rainbrooke Drive Pittsford, NY 14534 / US | 07 /
KIRK, Renee 7474 Baptist Hill Road Bloomfield, NY 14469 / US | [2015/25] |
Former [2015/17] | 01 /
SMITH, Ernest S. 328 Boston Road Ontario, NY 14519 / US | ||
02 /
PANDINA, Tracy 115 Timarron Trail Rochester, NY 14612 / US | |||
03 /
CROY, Leslie A. 5899 Stone Hill Road Lakeville, NY 14480 / US | |||
04 /
PARIS, Mark 24 Bosworth Field Mendon, NY 14506 / US | |||
05 /
ZAUDERER, Maurice 44 Woodland Road Pittsford, NY 14534 / US | |||
06 /
MOKSA, Angelika 14 Rainbrooke Drive Pittsford, NY 14534 / US | |||
07 /
KIRK, Renee 7474 Baptist Hill Road Bloomfield, NY 14469 / US | |||
Former [2015/10] | 01 /
SMITH, Ernest, S. 328 Boston Road Ontario, NY 14519 / US | ||
02 /
PANDINA, Tracy 115 Timarron Trail Rochester, NY 14612 / US | |||
03 /
CROY, Leslie, A. 5899 Stone Hill Road Lakeville, NY 14480 / US | |||
04 /
PARIS, Mark 94 Fitzpatrick Trail West Henrietta, NY 14586 / US | |||
05 /
ZAUDERER, Maurice 44 Woodland Road Pittsford, NY 14534 / US | |||
06 /
MOKSA, Angelika 14 Rainbrooke Drive Pittsford, NY 14534 / US | |||
07 /
KIRK, Renee 7474 Baptist Hill Road Bloomfield, NY 14469 / US | Representative(s) | Inspicos P/S Agern Allé 24 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2019/04] | Inspicos P/S Kogle Allé 2 2970 Hørsholm / DK | ||
Former [2015/10] | Inspicos A/S Kogle Allé 2 P.O. Box 45 2970 Hørsholm / DK | Application number, filing date | 13780660.0 | 26.04.2013 | [2019/04] | WO2013US38497 | Priority number, date | US201261639046P | 26.04.2012 Original published format: US 201261639046 P | US201261732776P | 03.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261732776 P | US201313844388 | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US201313844388 | [2015/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013163602 | Date: | 31.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2841606 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2841606 | Date: | 23.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/70, C07K14/005, C07K16/00, C12N15/10, C12N15/86, C40B40/02 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
C12N15/1037 (EP,US);
C07K16/00 (EP,CN,US);
C07K14/005 (EP,CN,US);
C07K16/005 (US);
C07K16/2803 (EP,US);
C07K16/32 (EP,US);
C12N15/86 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2317/522 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2317/56 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2319/03 (EP,CN,US);
C12N2710/24122 (EP,CN,US);
C12N2710/24143 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/10] | C12Q1/70 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FUSIONSPROTEINE ZUR AUSWAHL VON MIT REKOMBINANTEM VACCINIAVIRUS MIT SPEZIFISCHEM IMMUNGLOBULINGEN INFIZIERTEN ZELLEN | [2015/10] | English: | FUSION PROTEINS TO FACILITATE SELECTION OF CELLS INFECTED WITH SPECIFIC IMMUNOGLOBULIN GENE RECOMBINANT VACCINIA VIRUS | [2015/10] | French: | PROTÉINES DE FUSION FACILITANT LA SÉLECTION DE CELLULES INFECTÉES PAR LE VIRUS RECOMBINANT DE LA VACCINE COMPORTANT DES GÈNES SPÉCIFIQUES DES IMMUNOGLOBULINES | [2015/10] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2014 | Search fee paid | 12.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/10] | 05.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 13.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/01] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 13.10.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 13.10.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.10.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.06.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.04.2013 | AL | 23.01.2019 | CY | 23.01.2019 | CZ | 23.01.2019 | EE | 23.01.2019 | HR | 23.01.2019 | LT | 23.01.2019 | LV | 23.01.2019 | MC | 23.01.2019 | MK | 23.01.2019 | MT | 23.01.2019 | RO | 23.01.2019 | RS | 23.01.2019 | SI | 23.01.2019 | SK | 23.01.2019 | SM | 23.01.2019 | TR | 23.01.2019 | BG | 23.04.2019 | GR | 24.04.2019 | IS | 23.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 26.04.2013 | |
AL | 23.01.2019 | ||
CY | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
MT | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 26.04.2013 | |
AL | 23.01.2019 | ||
CY | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CY | 23.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
TR | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SI | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
MC | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
SM | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 23.01.2019 | |
CZ | 23.01.2019 | ||
EE | 23.01.2019 | ||
HR | 23.01.2019 | ||
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
RO | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
SK | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HR | 23.01.2019 | |
LT | 23.01.2019 | ||
LV | 23.01.2019 | ||
RS | 23.01.2019 | ||
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 23.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | LT | 23.01.2019 | |
BG | 23.04.2019 | ||
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | LT | 23.01.2019 | |
GR | 24.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | LT | 23.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP1516932 (TRANSGENE SA [FR]) [X] 2,10 * paragraph [0114] - paragraph [0117] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0015] * [Y] 1,3-9 [I] 11-15; | [Y]US2005266425 (ZAUDERER MAURICE [US], et al) [Y] 1,3-9 * figure 9 *; | [A] - "RecName: Full=Protein A56; AltName: Full=Hemagglutinin; Flags: Precursor;", UniProt, (19930401), Database accession no. Q01218, URL: EBI, XP002750909 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2005266425 (ZAUDERER MAURICE [US], et al); | [A]US2009304627 (DRAGHIA-AKLI RUXANDRA [BE], et al); | [A]US2010081575 (WILLIAMSON ROBERT ANTHONY [US], et al); | [Y] - GALMICHE ET AL., "Expression of a functional single chain antibody on the surface of extracellular enveloped vaccinia virus as a step towards selective tumour cell targeting", JOURNAL OF GENERAL VIROLOGY, (19971101), vol. 78, pages 3019 - 3027, XP002173264 | [Y] - SMITH ET AL., "Nucleotide sequence of 42 kbp of vaccinia virus strain WR from near the right inverted terminal repeat", JOURNAL OF GENERAL VIROLOGY, (19910601), vol. 72, pages 1349 - 1376, XP000974192 | by applicant | EP1516932 | - KIM L. ROBERTS; GEOFFREY L. SMITH, Trends in Microbiology, (20080000), vol. 16, no. 10, pages 472 - 479 | - GEOFFREY L. SMITH et al., Journal of General Virology, (20020000), vol. 83, pages 2915 - 2931 | - HAMMOND J.M. et al., J Virol. Methods, (19970000), vol. 66, pages 135 - 8 | - CHAKRABARTI S. et al., Biotechniques, (19970000), vol. 23, pages 1094 - 7 | - Current Protocols in Immunology, John Wiley & Sons | - CAMPBELL, A. et al., "Monoclonal Antibody Technology", CAMPBELL, A. et al., Burden, R., et al., Laboratory Techniques in Biochemistry and Molecular Biology, Elsevere, (19840000), vol. 13 |