EP2900607 - METHOD FOR TREATING A LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.12.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Büttner, Klaus Sandweg 138 25336 Klein Nordende / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/32] | For all designated states Büttner, Klaus Sandweg 138 D-25336 Klein Nordende / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/32] | Representative(s) | Lobemeier, Martin Landolf Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Holtenauer Strasse 57 24105 Kiel / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/32] | Lobemeier, Martin Landolf Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Niemannsweg 133 24105 Kiel / DE | Application number, filing date | 13782944.6 | 18.09.2013 | WO2013DE100334 | Priority number, date | DE20121018995 | 27.09.2012 Original published format: DE102012018995 | [2015/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014048417 | Date: | 03.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2900607 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/72, C02F1/36, C02F1/32, C02F1/74, C02F103/18 | [2015/32] | CPC: |
C02F1/36 (EP,US);
C02F1/32 (EP,US);
C02F1/72 (EP,US);
B63J4/00 (EP,US);
C02F1/74 (EP,US);
C02F2103/005 (EP,US);
C02F2103/008 (EP,US);
C02F2103/18 (EP,US);
C02F2301/024 (EP,US);
C02F2303/26 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT | [2015/32] | English: | METHOD FOR TREATING A LIQUID | [2015/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'UN LIQUIDE | [2015/32] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/32] | 14.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/04] | 18.09.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |