10.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
07.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.07.2019 [2019/28] |
22.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
30.12.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.01.2019 [2019/05] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
16.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
14.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] |
07.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] |
31.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] |
10.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] |
03.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] |
27.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] |
30.03.2018 |
Correction of patent specification |
published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] |
23.02.2018 |
Change - applicant |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
19.01.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] |
15.01.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.01.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
10.01.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
18.10.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.10.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.10.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
06.10.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
30.08.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
26.08.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.05.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.04.2016 |
First examination report |
|
25.12.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 27.01.2016 [2016/04] |
16.10.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
09.10.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.07.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
31.07.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
20.05.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.05.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
12.05.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.05.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.05.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.11.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|