EP2922741 - FORWARD STRUCTURE ARRANGEMENT, WHICH IS SUPPORTED ON A FRONT AXLE, OF A COMMERCIAL VEHICLE FOR THE CONTROLLED CONVERSION OF CRASH ENERGY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÄUSSLER, Markus Waldstrasse 7 89081 Ulm / DE | 02 /
JÄNCHEN, Jens Am Kellerberg 30a 89284 Pfaffenhofen / DE | 03 /
MÖNNICH, Thomas Pfarrer-Bosch-Weg 17 89160 Dornstadt / DE | [2015/40] | Application number, filing date | 13783850.4 | 25.10.2013 | [2015/40] | WO2013EP03220 | Priority number, date | DE20121022628 | 20.11.2012 Original published format: DE102012022628 | [2015/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014079529 | Date: | 30.05.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2922741 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B62D21/15, B62D47/02 | [2015/40] | CPC: |
B62D21/152 (EP);
B62D47/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/40] | Title | German: | AN EINER VORDERACHSE ABGESTÜTZTE VORBAUANORDNUNG EINES NUTZFAHRZEUGES ZUR KONTROLLIERTEN WANDLUNG VON CRASHENERGIE | [2015/40] | English: | FORWARD STRUCTURE ARRANGEMENT, WHICH IS SUPPORTED ON A FRONT AXLE, OF A COMMERCIAL VEHICLE FOR THE CONTROLLED CONVERSION OF CRASH ENERGY | [2015/40] | French: | ENSEMBLE AVANT-CORPS D'UN VÉHICULE UTILITAIRE PRENANT APPUI SUR UN ESSIEU AVANT ET PERMETTANT LA CONVERSION CONTRÔLÉE D'UNE ÉNERGIE DE CRASH | [2015/40] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/40] | 23.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH1045041 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [X] 1,2,5,9,10 * abstract *; | [X]JPH11235987 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD) [X] 1,2,5,9,10 * figures 1,3,4,6 *; | [X]JPH11208516 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD) [X] 1,2,5,9,10 * abstract *; | [I]WO2006049536 (VOLVO LASTVAGNAR AB [SE], et al) [I] 1,5-10 * paragraph [0019]; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]JPH11227630 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD) [Y] 1,2,5,9,10 * abstract *; | [Y]JPH11180351 (HINO MOTORS LTD) [Y] 1,2,5,9,10 * abstract * | by applicant | DE102004019148 | DE102007026951 | DE60109399T | DE2853621 |